Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePRO PUBLICA, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02462
Date Filed2016-12-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPRO PUBLICA, INC.
Case DescriptionProPublica submitted a FOIA request to the Veterans Health Administration for communications between Alvin Young, an agency consultant on the effects of Agent Orange and other herbicides, and a number of agency staff. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but despite a number of inquiries by ProPublica as to the status of its request, the agency failed to respond and ProPublica filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-12-161COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4780118) filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons TO UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, # 9 Summons TO UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, # 10 Summons TO UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-162LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PRO PUBLICA, INC. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-193REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs re 1 Complaint, filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC..(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-194REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC..(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-195REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to U.S. Attorney General filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC..(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-19Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sb) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-196SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-297RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/23/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/22/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
2016-12-298RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
2016-12-299RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 12/23/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
2017-01-2310MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by PRO PUBLICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Amended Complaint, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2311NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2312Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-3013RESPONSE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS re 10 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Schaefer, Daniel) Modified event title on 1/31/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-30MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint attached to Plaintiff's motion is DEEMED filed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/30/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-3014AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(znmw) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-01MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to 14 Plaintiff's amended complaint on or before March 1, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/1/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/1/2017 (tj) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-0215MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PRO PUBLICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Declaration of Charles Ornstein, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Ornstein Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Ornstein Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Ornstein Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Ornstein Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Ornstein Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Ornstein Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Ornstein Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 8 to Ornstein Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 9 to Ornstein Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 10 to Ornstein Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 11 to Ornstein Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 12 to Ornstein Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 13 to Ornstein Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 14 to Ornstein Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 15 to Ornstein Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 16 to Ornstein Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 17 to Ornstein Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 18 to Ornstein Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 19 to Ornstein Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 20 to Ornstein Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 21 to Ornstein Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 22 to Ornstein Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 23 to Ornstein Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 24 to Ornstein Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 25 to Ornstein Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 26 to Ornstein Declaration, # 29 Exhibit 27 to Ornstein Declaration, # 30 Exhibit 28 to Ornstein Declaration, # 31 Exhibit 29 to Ornstein Declaration, # 32 Exhibit 30 to Ornstein Declaration, # 33 Exhibit 31 to Ornstein Declaration, # 34 Exhibit 32 to Ornstein Declaration, # 35 Exhibit 33 to Ornstein Declaration, # 36 Exhibit 34 to Ornstein Declaration, # 37 Exhibit 35 to Ornstein Declaration, # 38 Exhibit 36 to Ornstein Declaration, # 39 Exhibit 37 to Ornstein Declaration, # 40 Exhibit 38 to Ornstein Declaration, # 41 Exhibit 39 to Ornstein Declaration, # 42 Declaration of Wesley T. Carter, # 43 Exhibit 1 to Carter Declaration, # 44 Exhibit 2 to Carter Declaration, # 45 Exhibit 3 to Carter Declaration, # 46 Exhibit 4 to Carter Declaration, # 47 Exhibit 5 to Carter Declaration, # 48 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-0916Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-09MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to 15 Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction on or before February 14, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/9/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-1417Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-17MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on 4 Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction on Friday, February 24, 2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/17/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-2118REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-22Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/24/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (ztj) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-2319NOTICE of Appearance by Giang T. Ton-that on behalf of PRO PUBLICA, INC. (Ton-that, Giang) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-24Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Motion Hearing held on 2/24/2017 re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC. Scheduling order to follow. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro Miller.) (tj) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-2420ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/24/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-24Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-03-1021RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 20 Order filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: J. Horan Decl., Mar. 10, 2017)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-1722RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 20 Order filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-24Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 3/24/2017. Parties advise the court of the status of this action. Order to be issued by the court. Next Status Conference set for 4/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro Miller.) (tj) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-2423ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/24/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-3124MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 14 Amended Complaint, Defendant's Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-1425Memorandum in opposition to re 24 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 14 Amended Complaint, Defendant's Answer filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-2126REPLY to opposition to motion re 24 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 14 Amended Complaint, Defendant's Answer filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-2427NOTICE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS re 23 Order (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-2528TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on March 24, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-15. Date of Issuance:April 25, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia A Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 5/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2017.(pk) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 27 Notice Regarding the Court's March 24, 2017 Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the agency representative responsible for this matter shall attend the status hearing set for April 27, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/26/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-2629RESPONSE re 27 Notice (Other) by VA Regarding the Courts March 24, 2017 Order filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-2630STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-27MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Defendant's Motion to Hold Deadline: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before June 27, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/27/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-27SCHEDULING MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to 30 Defendant's Status Report on or before May 4, 2017 and Defendant shall reply on or before May 11, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on May 18, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/27/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-27Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 4/27/2017. Scheduling order entered. (Status Conference set for 5/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro Miller.) (tj) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/4/2017 Replies due by 5/11/2017. (tj) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/27/2017, (tj) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-2831TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on April 27, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-36. Date of Issuance:April 28, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia A Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Tape Number: Patricia_Kaneshiro-Miller@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 5/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2017.(pk) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-0432RESPONSE re 30 Status Report filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-1133RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration J. Buck Decl., dated May 11, 2017)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1734MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support thereof by PRO PUBLICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Interrogatories to VA, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Requests for Production to VA, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) Modified event title on 5/18/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-18MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a status update on or before May 25, 2017 addressing any additional resources allocated for FOIA processing. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file a comprehensive status report on or before June 16, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on June 22, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/18/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/18/17 : Status Conference held. Further Status Conference set for 6/22/17 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (Court Reporter : Pat Kaneshiro-Miller) (kk) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines : Defendant's status update regarding additional resources allocated for FOIA processing due by 5/25/17; Defendant's next comprehensive status report due by 6/16/17. (kk) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Update due by 5/25/2017. Status Report due by 6/16/2017. Status Conference set for 6/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (hs) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-1935TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on May 18, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-36. Date of Issuance:May 19, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia A Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Tape Number: Patricia_Kaneshiro-Miller@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 6/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2017.(pk) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-2536STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-3137Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support thereof filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-0738REPLY to opposition to motion re 34 MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support thereof filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC.. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-1239ERRATA by PRO PUBLICA, INC. 38 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC.. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-1640NOTICE of Filing of Declaration by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Buck, June 16, 2017)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-1941NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PRO PUBLICA, INC.. Attorney Giang T. Ton-that terminated. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-22MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its declarations addressing information technology issues on or before June 29, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file a comprehensive status report on or before July 24, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 27, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/22/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-22Minute Entry for status conference held before Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/22/17: Declarations due on or before 6/29/17. Status Report due by 7/24/2017. Next Status Conference set for 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro Miller.) (tj) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-2742NOTICE of Change of Address by Seth A. Watkins (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-2743ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. Related document: 14 Amended Complaint, filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC..(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-2744NOTICE of Filing of Declaration by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Ramos, dated June 23, 2017)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff