Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2016cv09796
Date Filed2016-12-20
Date Closed2017-02-28
JudgeJudge Jesse M. Furman
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council
DefendantUnited States Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-12-201COMPLAINT against United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13117087)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council.(Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-202CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-203RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council.(Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-204REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-215FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Aaron Colangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13121518. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Colangelo, Aaron) Modified on 12/21/2016 (jcu). (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-21>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 5 MOTION for Aaron Colangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13121518. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. .. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing affidavit;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (jcu) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-21CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (kl) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-21Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (kl) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-21Case Designated ECF. (kl) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-216ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Environmental Protection Agency. (kl) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-237MOTION for Aaron Colangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Colangelo, Aaron) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2016-12-23>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Aaron Colangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2016-12-238NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/8/2017 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/22/2016) (mro) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2016-12-259ORDER granting 7 Motion for Aaron Colangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 12/25/2016)
2016-12-2810NOTICE of Proof of Service of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Colangelo, Aaron) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
2017-01-1811LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Emily Bretz dated 1/18/17. Document filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency.(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-1812ORDER granting 11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The United States Environmental Protection Agency's answer is due 2/27/2017. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-02-1013NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Aaron Colangelo on behalf of Natural Resources Defense Council. New Address: Natural Resources Defense Council, 1152 15th Street NW, Suite 300, Washington, DC, United States 20005, 202-289-2376. (Colangelo, Aaron) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-2714LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Based on Stipulation and Order (attached) addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Emily Bretz dated 2/27/2017. Document filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation and Order)(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-2715ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency.(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-2816STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendant hereby stipulate and agree as follows: 1. As soon as practicable after the Court has endorsed and docketed this Stipulation as an Order of this Court, the United States shall pay $2,500 to Plaintiffby electronic funds transfer in accordance with instructions provided to government counsel by Plaintiff's counsel. 2. Any obligation of the United States to expend funds under this Stipulation is subject to the availability of appropriations in accordance with the Anti-Deficiency Act, 31 U.S.C. § 1341. This Stipulation shall not be construed to require the United States to obligate or pay funds in contravention of the Anti-Deficiency Act. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 14 and to close this case. All motions are denied as moot. All conferences are cancelled. (As further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/28/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff