Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02517
Date Filed2016-12-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted requests to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence, the CIA, the FBI, and the Department of Homeland Security concerning communications to and from members of the Electoral College, or members of Congress and various political groups, concerning a variety of issues. Their request to the FBI also asked for any communications between FBI Director Comey and the White House concerning the allegations of Russian hacking. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Leopold and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
TERMINATED: 02/17/2017
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
The Executive Office
Office of the Legal Adviser, Suite 5,600
600 19th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20522
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-12-261COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4788146) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/26/2016)
2016-12-27Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sb) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2016-12-272SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2017-01-033ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 3, 2017. (NS) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-02-174AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-175REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 4 Amended Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. Related document: 4 Amended Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-216SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (znmw) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-227RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/22/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/24/2017.) (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-108NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Pezzi on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-209ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. Related document: 4 Amended Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2110ORDER. Joint Status Report due April 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/21/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2017. (dot) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-04-1011Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Dec. 14, 2016 Request to CIA, # 2 Dec. 15, 2016 Request to CIA)(Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-11MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that the Defendants are in the process of determining how to respond to Plaintiffs' requests, including analyzing whether they will need to issue Glomar responses and how to best search for responsive records. The parties are currently discussing potentially narrowing or clarifying Plaintiffs' requests, and ask to be permitted to submit a further status report on or before May 10, 2017. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file a further status report by no later than MAY 10, 2017, updating the Court on the parties' progress negotiating the scope of Plaintiffs' requests and Defendants' progress in responding to those requests. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/11/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2017. (dot) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-05-1012Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-10MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that they have made progress in negotiating the scope of Plaintiffs' FOIA requests and in preparing adequate searches that will result in Plaintiffs receiving any documents to which they are entitled while avoiding unreasonable burden on the Defendants, and that these discussions are ongoing. The parties further represent that it would be premature at this time to set a summary judgment briefing schedule. At the parties' request, the Court sets the following schedule: Defendants shall formally respond to Plaintiffs' FOIA requests with any partial Glomar responses by no later than JUNE 23, 2017. Additionally, one or more Defendants shall make an initial production of responsive documents to Plaintiffs by no later than JUNE 23, 2017, and one or more Defendants shall then make rolling productions once every six weeks thereafter. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report updating the Court on the parties' progress negotiating the scope of Plaintiffs' requests and Defendants' progress in responding to those requests by no later than SEPTEMBER 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/10/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall formally respond to Plaintiffs' FOIA requests with any partial Glomar responses by no later than 6/23/2017; One or more Defendants shall make an initial production of responsive documents to Plaintiffs by no later than 6/23/2017; Joint Status Report due by no later than 9/29/2017. (kt) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-06-2313Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Invoke Any Partial Glomar Responses by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-26MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 13 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendants request a one week extension of time to invoke any partial Glomar responses in response to Plaintiffs' FOIA requests because Defendants need additional time to discuss and decide the appropriate breadth of any such responses. Defendants' motion is untimely, as it was made the same day as the affected deadline, but they represent that the need for the extension was not apparent until that day. This is the first motion for an extension of time filed in this case, and Plaintiffs consent. Accordingly, Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Defendants may formally invoke any partial Glomar responses by no later than JUNE 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/26/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff