Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00001
Date Filed2017-01-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the agency's contacts with the news media and the entertainment industry pertaining to its portrayal in the media. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and Leopold agreed to limit his request to those records found at the Office of Public Affairs. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-011COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4792161) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/01/2017)
2017-01-03Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-133NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Castellano on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Castellano, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-02-024ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Castellano, Daniel) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-215Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Castellano, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-23MINUTE ORDER granting 5 joint motion to enter proposed scheduling order. Defendant shall process the first 500 pages of responsive records and issue its first release of all non-exempt information to Plaintiff by no later than March 31, 2017. Defendant shall make three additional releases on or before May 1, 2017, May 31, 2017, and June 30, 2017. Defendant shall process and release all responsive records to Plaintiff by no later than June 30, 2017. The parties are directed to file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than May 5, 2017. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/23/2017. (lcegs4) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/5/2017. (mac) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-05-056Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Castellano, Daniel) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-05MINUTE ORDER. In light of 6 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than June 9, 2017. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/5/2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report Or Individual Recommendation due by 6/9/2017. (mac) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-06-087Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Castellano, Daniel) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-07-148Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Castellano, Daniel) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff