Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00002
Date Filed2017-01-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for all volumes of the CIA internal newsletter published in 2016. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Leopold to identify the name of the publication. Leopold indicated he was seeking copies of "What's News." After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-011COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4792163) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/01/2017)
2017-01-03Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-02-033ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than 2/24/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/3/17. (DJS) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-244Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-28MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Status Report 4 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report by September 14, 2017. The parties are reminded that each status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/28/17. (DJS) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2017. (tb) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-09-145Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-146Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JASON LEOPOLD. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-19MINUTE ORDER: Granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Joint Status due October 16, 2017 and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the status report contains a proposed schedule for moving forward with this case, the parties shall also submit a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/19/17. (DJS) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2017. (tb) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-10-277Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff