Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. U.S Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv00053
Date Filed2017-01-04
Date Closed2017-06-06
JudgeJudge Loretta A. Preska
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the National Security Division of the Department of Justice for documents from the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court docket that resulted in an order to Yahoo in 2015 directing it to use its email scanning system to search for a cyber-identifier. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further, the New York Times and Savage filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-041COMPLAINT against U.S Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13160398)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-042CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-043RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Finaciero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-044REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-05CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-05Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (pc) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-05Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-055ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S Department of Justice. (pc) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-066NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian MacDougall on behalf of Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (MacDougall, Ian) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-207NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of U.S Department of Justice. (Byars, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
2017-02-078ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Byars, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-03-169ORDER OF CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/31/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 03/16/2017) (ras) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-2010LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated March 20, 2017 re: parties' joint proposal for briefing schedule for cross-motions for summary judgment. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Byars, Michael) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2211MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated March 20, 2017 re: parties' joint proposal for briefing schedule for cross-motions for summary judgment. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: 1. 2. The March 31 conference is adjourned sine die. So ordered. The following hearing(s) was terminated: Initial Conference. (Cross Motions due by 6/19/2017. Motions due by 5/17/2017. Responses due by 7/19/2017. Replies due by 8/21/2017.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/22/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-05-1512LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file summary judgment motions addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated May 15, 2017. Document filed by U.S Department of Justice.(Byars, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-2413ORDER granting 12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/24/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-06-0614STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties as follows: 1. This action is voluntarily dismissed by plaintiffs; and 2. The parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees, costs, etc., in this action. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/6/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff