Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFET BOARD
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00026
Date Filed2017-01-05
Date Closed2017-07-11
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Energy & Environment Legal Institute submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Chemical Safety Board for communications sent by Board member Richard Engler to or from five named individuals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFET BOARD
DefendantUNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFETY BOARD
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-051COMPLAINT against U.S. Chemical Safety Board ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4796272) filed by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to US Attorney, # 3 Summons to Chemical Safety Board, # 4 Summons to US Attorney General)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-06Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-062SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFET BOARD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-263NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-02-214ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFET BOARD.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-215GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 21, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/22/2017. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFET BOARD served on 1/24/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/23/2017. (See Docket Entry 6 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-04-07MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this action qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before May 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 7, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Schedule due by 5/1/2017. (hs) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-118Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFETY BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before May 15, 2017, updating the Court as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 12, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2017 (hs) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-05-059NOTICE of Appearance by Chaim Mandelbaum on behalf of ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/8/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-1210JOINT STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) Modified on 5/15/2017 to correct docket text (jf). (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before June 2, 2017, updating the Court as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 17, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/2/2017 (hs) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-06-0211Joint STATUS REPORT by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before June 15, 2017, updating the Court as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 2, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2017 (hs) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFETY BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-2213Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFETY BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-2914Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFETY BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-1115STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES CHEMICAL SAFETY BOARD. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 11, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff