Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00051
Date Filed2017-01-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC
Case DescriptionThe Free Market Environmental Law Clinic submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute for Environmental Health Services for records concerning work done by Dr. Gloria Jahnke in her role as the agency's representative to the International Agency for Research on Cancer. FMELC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but denied the request on the basis that the records were not agency records. The agency also classified FMELC as a commercial requester and assessed it $46 in fees. FMELC filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FMELC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-111COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4801796) filed by FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Civil Process Clerk of US Attorney, # 3 Summons To Dept of Health and Human Services, # 4 Summons to Attorney General)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-11Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-03-073NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-154ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-16MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before March 31, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/16/17. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-315Joint STATUS REPORT with Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 5 Joint Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 28, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/31/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-286Joint STATUS REPORT with Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 6 the Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before June 9, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/28/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-06-097Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before July 10, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/9/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-07-108Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before July 27, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/11/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-279Joint STATUS REPORT by FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC. (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before August 31, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/27/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/31/2017 (tj) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-3110Joint STATUS REPORT by FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC. (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the Parties' Joint Report and Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before September 29, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/31/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-2911Joint STATUS REPORT by FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC. (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit their next joint status report no later than October 30, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/02/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-2712Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' joint status report and proposed schedule for further proceedings, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit their next joint status report addressing the need for further proceedings in this case on or before November 27, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/30/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/27/2017 (tj) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-2713Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit their next joint status report on or before January 10, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/27/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/10/2018. (tj) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-12-05Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff