Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00053
Date Filed2017-01-11
Date Closed2017-10-03
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning the decision not to conduct an assessment of the damage to national security from Hillary Clinton's decision to use a private email server. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-111COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4802512) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons US Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 2 Summons US Attorney General, # 3 Summons ODNI)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-112LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-113CIVIL COVER SHEET by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-12Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-124SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/22/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/23/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 1/23/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-02-226ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Riess, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-227GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 22, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-228ENTERED IN ERROR***ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 22, 2017. (lcrbw1) Modified on 2/22/2017, Document removed per chamber's request (hs). (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-22MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before March 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 22, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed schedule due by 3/15/2017. (hs) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-159Joint STATUS REPORT (Proposed Schedule) by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riess, Daniel) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-1610ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Proposed Schedule, the Court hereby enters the following schedule governing proceedings in this case: (1) The defendant shall complete its search for documents responsive to the plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act request and produce all non-exempt responsive documents to Plaintiff on or before May 8, 2017; (2) The plaintiff shall notify the defendant whether, and to what extent, it intends to challenge the adequacy of the search conducted by the defendant or any of the withholdings by the defendant on or before May 30, 2017; (3) In the event the plaintiff decides not to challenge either the adequacy of the search conducted by the defendant or any of the withholdings by the defendant, the parties shall promptly notify the Court that merits briefing will not be necessary; (4) In the event the plaintiff notifies the defendant that it intends to challenge the adequacy of the search conducted by the defendant or any of the withholdings by the defendant, the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed merits briefing schedule to the Court on or before June 19, 2017; (5)In the event that unforeseen circumstances require additional time for the completion of production, or that the number of responsive documents proves to be significantly larger than anticipated, the parties may seek leave from the Court to modify this proposed schedule. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 16, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed briefing schedule due by 6/19/2017. (hs) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-06-1911Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report and Briefing Schedule by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 11 Joint Status Report and Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a status report with a proposed briefing schedule on or before July 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 20, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/3/2017 (hs) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20NOTICE OF ERROR re 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File; emailed to jaldrich@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. On future filings, please make sure that each event pertaining to your document is filed Modified on 6/21/2017 (ztd). (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-0312Joint STATUS REPORT with Proposed Briefing Schedule by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riess, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report with Proposed Briefing Schedule, the Court hereby enters the following schedule governing merits briefing in this case: (1) the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment with respect to its withholdings pursuant to Exemption 5 of the Freedom of Information Act on or before August 15, 2017; (2) the plaintiff shall file its opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before September 15, 2017; and (3) the defendant shall file its reply brief in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before October 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 5, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 8/15/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/15/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/6/2017. (hs) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-08-1513MOTION for Summary Judgment by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Gaviria Declaration), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Vaughn Index), # 4 Statement of Facts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Riess, Daniel) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-09-1514RESPONSE re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-10-0215STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-03MINUTE ORDER. In light of the plaintiff's 15 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the defendant's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 3, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff