Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00060
Date Filed2017-01-11
Date Closed2017-01-30
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to Fort Leonard Wood for records concerning a PowerPoint presentation on operational security delivered to soldiers at Fort Leonard Wood depicting David Petraeus and Hillary Clinton as examples of "insider threats." Fort Leonard Wood acknowledged receipt of the request and referred it to the Deputy Chief of Staff at the Department of Defense. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-111COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4802903) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Defense)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-112LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-12Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zsb) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-184MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric W. Lee, :Firm- Judicial Watch, Inc., :Address- 425 Third Street SW, Suite 800. Phone No. - (202) 646-5172. Fax No. - (202) 646-5199 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4810935. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric W. Lee, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 4 the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Eric W. Lee is admitted to practice pro hac vice in this case on behalf of plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/18/17. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/22/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/23/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 1/23/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-266NOTICE of Appearance by Derrick Wayne Grace on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Grace, Derrick) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-01-307NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff