Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePORUP v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00072
Date Filed2017-01-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJENS PORUP
Case DescriptionJens Porup, a freelance reporter on national security and cybersecurity issues, submitted a number of FOIA requests to the CIA concerning its involvement with assassinations of foreign leaders and other allegedly illegal activities. The CIA told Porup that it could neither confirm nor deny the existence of such records. Porup then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-121COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4803782) filed by JENS PORUP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons CIA, # 3 Summons USADC, # 4 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-122NOTICE of ECF Filing Error by JENS PORUP (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-12Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 1/23/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/22/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-02-037Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Bitran, Eva) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-06MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant shall file an answer no later than March 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/6/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-03-158MOTION to Dismiss Count II of the Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Bitran, Eva) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-299AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY filed by JENS PORUP.(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-2910NOTICE of Filing of First Amended Complaint by JENS PORUP (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-1211ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Related document: 9 Amended Complaint filed by JENS PORUP.(Bitran, Eva) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-13MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by April 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/13/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/28/2017 (zlsj) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-2812Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Bitran, Eva) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that disclosure shall proceed according to the following schedule in this case: Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with URLs for all previously disclosed documents no later than May 1, 2017; Defendant shall make its first production of non-exempt portions of responsive records no later than June 28, 2017; Defendant shall make a second production of non-exempt portions of responsive records no later than August 28, 2017, if needed; Defendant shall make a third production of non-exempt portions of responsive records no later than October 27, 2017, if needed. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall propose a joint schedule for briefing on any appropriate motions no later than November 10, 2017. The parties shall brief Counts 1 and 2 together, according to the same briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-07-2013NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kelly Brian McClanahan on behalf of JENS PORUP Substituting for attorney Bradley Moss (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-08-1814NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael Leon Drezner on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Eva L. Bitran (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-10-3115Joint STATUS REPORT and Motion for Modification of Production Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-10-3116Joint MOTION to Modify Production Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JENS PORUP. (See Docket Entry 15 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-08MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Modification of Production Schedule. While the motion does not provide a satisfactory explanation for why these documents were initially deemed non-responsive, the Court will reluctantly adopt the parties' proposed production schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/8/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Because an amended complaint was filed after Defendant filed its motion to dismiss count two of the original complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that 8 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/30/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2018-09-2117STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 Defendant's Status Report, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to notify Defendant by September 28, 2018, of any objections or challenges to the FOIA response in this case, including any objections or challenges to documents produced pursuant to the JFK Act. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/24/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's objections or challenges to the FOIA response in this case, including any objections or challenges to documents produced pursuant to the JFK Act due by 9/28/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-3118Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-12-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule, it is ORDERED that the parties' proposed schedule is adopted. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before February 19, 2019; Plaintiff shall file a response and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 15, 2019; Defendant shall file its response and/or reply on or before April 5, 2019; and Plaintiff shall a reply, if necessary, on or before April 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/10/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 2/19/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/15/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/5/2019. Replies due by 4/26/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2019-01-1719MOTION to Stay by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-17MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the case shall be stayed pending renewed funding. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/17/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-2820NOTICE by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-0121Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion to Modify. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' proposed modified schedule is adopted. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before March 29, 2019; Plaintiff shall file a response and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 26, 2019; Defendant shall file its response and/or reply on or before May 24, 2019, 2019; and Plaintiff shall a reply, if necessary, on or before June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/1/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 3/29/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/26/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/24/2019. Replies due by 6/21/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-03-2622Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-26MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall brief the instant case pursuant to the following schedule: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before April 12, 2019; Plaintiff shall file a response and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before May 10, 2019; Defendant shall file its response and/or reply on or before June 7, 2019; and Plaintiff shall a reply, if necessary, on or before July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/26/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/12/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/10/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/7/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-1223MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1- FOIA Request Correspondence, # 3 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Antoinette B. Shiner, # 4 Exhibit 3- Letters Cited by Plaintiff, # 5 Exhibit 4- Vaughn Index, # 6 Statement of Facts, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-1724ERRATA by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- FOIA Request Correspondence, # 2 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Antoinette B. Shiner, # 3 Exhibit 3- Letters Cited by Plaintiff, # 4 Exhibit 4- Vaughn Index)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-05-1025Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JENS PORUP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-13MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file a response by May 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/13/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/17/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-1726Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JENS PORUP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-2127Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JENS PORUP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - McClanahan declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Bosanko-McClanahan email, # 3 Exhibit C - NARA 1602-1, # 4 Exhibit D - Slaughter Lavergne declaration, # 5 Exhibit E - Released records, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-2128NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by JENS PORUP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F - New denial letters)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-2129Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JENS PORUP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-21MINUTE ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to 23 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due May 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/21/2019. (lccrc1) Modified on 5/21/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-21MINUTE ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/21/2019. (lccrc1) Modified on 5/21/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-06-0330Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-07MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time. The government shall file its reply by June 28, 2019. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/7/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 6/28/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-2831REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Corrected Vaughn Index)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-08-0932Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-14MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order. The supplemental briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: Defendant shall file its supplemental brief on or before September 20, 2019; Plaintiff shall respond to that supplemental brief on or before October 11, 2019; Plaintiff shall file his motion for leave to file a sur-reply to 31 Defendant's prior reply brief on or before October 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/14/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar