Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELGABROWNY v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00066
Date Filed2017-01-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffIBRAHIM ELGABROWNY
Case DescriptionIbrahim Elgabrowny, convicted of conspiracy charges relating to the 1993 World Trade Center bombing, submitted FOIA requests to the CIA and the Justice Department for records concerning his trial. He also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The CIA denied his request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Elgabrowny filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantJOHN BERNNAN CIA Director
TERMINATED: 01/11/2017
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S
TERMINATED: 01/11/2017
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
TERMINATED: 01/11/2017
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantLORETTA E. LYNCH U.S. Attorney General
TERMINATED: 01/11/2017
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantJOHN KERRY Secretary of State
TERMINATED: 01/11/2017
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [58]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-111COMPLAINT against JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-112MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by IBRAHIM ELGABRONY (td). (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-113PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (td) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-114ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $17.74 from Prison Account of IBRAHIM ELGABRONY and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/9/17. (td) . (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-115ORDERED that this civil action shall proceed under the Freedom of Information Act against the Central Intelligence Agency, the United States Department of Justice and the United States Department of State. John O. Brennan, Loretta E. Lynch and John Kerry are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as party defendants. (See order for further details.). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/9/17. (td) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-176SUMMONS (3) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jd) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LORETTA E. LYNCH served on 1/25/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/25/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/25/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/25/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2017.) (jf) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-14Partial Filing Fee Received from IBRAHIM ELGABRONY in the amount of $17.74, receipt number: 4616082941. (zrdj) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-158RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to Defendant U.S. Department of State. (td) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-219RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 2/6/2017 (td) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-2410First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-2711NOTICE of Change of Address by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (td) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-29MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 10 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. The Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by April 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/29/17. (ms) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/26/2017. (tb) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-3112NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Wynne Kelly (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-1313Mail Returned as undeliverable: Minute Order filed on 03/29/17 was returned and re-mailed to the defendant. Defendant's registration number was wrong. Minute Order re-mailed on 04/13/17. (tb) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-2114Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Document by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-24MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 14 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by June 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/24/17. (ms) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/12/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-06-1215ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-1416ORDER directing defendants to file a status report by July 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/14/17. (ms) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/7/2017. (tb) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-2917MOTION for Leave to File for Plaintiff to submit his first Amended Complaint by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(td) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-0718STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed "Motion for a Court Leave for Plaintiff to Submit His First Amended Complaint" 17 is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by July 28, 2017, and shall file a Status Report by August 4, 2017 on the progress of their production of records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request(s). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/7/17. (ms) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-0725FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 5, # 2 Part 3 of 5, # 3 Part 4 of 5, # 4 Part 5 of 5)(td) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/28/2017. Status Report due by 8/4/2017. (tb) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1119MOTION to Clarify by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-25MINUTE ORDER: Granting 19 Motion to Clarify. Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by July 28, 2017, and shall file a Status Report by August 4, 2017, on the progress of their production of records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request(s). Defendants shall be relieved of the obligation to respond to the Amended Complaint in full and may instead file a Supplemental Answer that solely responds to paragraphs 75 to 80 and 115 to 118 of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/25/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/28/2017. Status Report due by 8/4/2017. (tb) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-2820ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-0421STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-07MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of 21 Defendants' Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Status Report by September 5, 2017 on the progress of the agencies' responses to Plaintiff's FOIA requests and a proposed schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/7/17. (ms) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Status Report due by 9/5/2017. (tb) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-1722NOTICE correcting inmate number by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (td) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-09-0523MOTION for Extension of Time to file Status Report by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-06MINUTE ORDER: Granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report. Defendant shall file a Status Report, proposed schedule and proposed order by by 9/12/17. The Court will view further requests for an extension with disfavor. Additionally, the Defendant shall resend a copy of its motion 23 to the Plaintiff using his correct inmate number (R28054-054) and file an updated certificate of service. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY, R28054-054, ELKTON FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 10, LISBON, OH 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/6/17. (DJS) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0624STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-1426MOTION to Amend/Correct 25 1st Amended Complaint by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (td) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-2827RESPONSE (Opposition) re 24 Status Report filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (td) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-1828ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-19MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed "Motion for a Court Leave for Plaintiff to Submit his Second Amended Complaint" 26 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Status Report by November 20, 2017 on the progress of the agencies' responses to Plaintiff's FOIA requests and a proposed schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/19/17. (ms) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-1929SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(znmw) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-2430CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 28 Answer to Complaint, . (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-11-2231MOTION for Leave to File Status Report Nunc Pro Tunc by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Status Report)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-27MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Status Report, Nunc Pro Tunc 31 is GRANTED, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their next Status Report by December 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/27/17. (ms) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-2732STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Nunc Pro Tunc to 11/22/17.) (td) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/22/2017. (tb) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-12-0733RESPONSE re 32 Status Report filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (td) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-2234STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-0335RESPONSE (Opposition) re 34 Status Report filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (td) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-1736ORDER directing defendants to file by March 1, 2018 a report on the status of plaintiff's FOIA requests to the CIA and the State Department, and a dispositive motion on the FBI's and the EOUSA's responses to plaintiff's FOIA requests. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/17/18. (ms) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report regarding plaintiff's FOIA requests due by 3/1/2018. (tb) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-02-2837MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motion by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-05MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' Motion for Extension of Time 37 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation and Executive Office for United States Attorneys shall file their dispositive motion by April 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/5/18. (ms) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0538MOTION for Leave to File Nunc Pro Tunc Status Report by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Status Report)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion due by 4/2/2018. (tb) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-06MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' Motion for Leave to File Status Report, Nunc Pro Tunc 38 is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, by April 2, 2018, defendants shall file a status report regarding the responses of the Central Intelligence Agency and the State Department to plaintiff's FOIA requests. With respect to the Central Intelligence Agency, defendants shall file a proposed schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/6/18. (ms) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-0639STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Granted Nunc Pro Tunc per Minute Order filed 3/6/18) (td) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/2/2018. (tb) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-3040MOTION for Extension of Time to File by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-0241MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-0442STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' 40 41 Motions for Extensions of Time are GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED the dispositive motion(s) on behalf of the Federal Bureau of Investigation and the Executive Office for United States Attorneys are due by May 17, 2018. No further extensions will be granted for these Defendants absent extraordinary circumstances. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the summary judgment motion on behalf of the Central Intelligence Agency is due by June 11, 2018; Plaintiff's opposition and combined cross-motion are due by July 11, 2018; CIA's reply and combined opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion are due by August 10, 2018; Plaintiff's reply is due by September 10, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a report on the status of the U.S. Department of State's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request is due by May 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/11/2018. (dm) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: FBI and the Executive office for US Attorneys dispositive motion(s) due by 5/17/2018. Summary Judgment motion due by 6/11/2018. Response and Cross Motion due by 7/11/2018. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 8/10/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/10/2018. Status Report on the U.S Department of State's response to plaintiff's FOIA request due by 5/7/2018. (tb) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-05-0444MOTION for Extension of Time for filing of Dispositive Motions by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (td) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-0743STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-1745MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants FBI and EOUSA by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-06-0746MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-08It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 44 is GRANTED. The Court also GRANTS Defendant Central Intelligence Agency's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion 46 . It is ORDERED that there will be no further extensions granted for this Defendant absent extraordinary circumstances. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the summary judgment motion on behalf of the Central Intelligence Agency is now due by June 25, 2018; Plaintiff's opposition and combined cross-motion are now due by July 25, 2018; CIA's reply and combined opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion are now due by August 27, 2018; Plaintiff's reply is now due by September 27, 2018. ORDER signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/8/18. (dm) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/25/2018. Response and Cross Motion due by 7/25/2018. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 8/27/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/27/2018. (tb) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-2547MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, E (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) Modified filers on 7/2/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-07-1648MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (ztd) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-25MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 48 is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's opposition and combined cross-motion are now due by September 7, 2018; CIA's reply and combined opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion are now due by October 8, 2018; Plaintiff's reply is now due by November 8, 2018. ORDER Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 07/25/18. (dm) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 9/7/2018. Response to Cross Motion due by 10/8/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/8/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/7/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-3149Fox/Neal Order advising Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by September 7, 2018, or the court may deem matter as conceded. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 07/31/2018. (dm) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motion due by 9/7/2008. (tb) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-3150MOTION for Extension of Time to File to file combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (ztd) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 50 is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Opposition and Combined Cross-Motion are now due by September 28, 2018; CIA's Reply and Combined Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion are now due by October 29, 2018; Plaintiff's Reply is now due by November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/11/2018. (dm) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Response and Cross Motion due by 9/28/2018. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 10/29/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/30/2018.(tb) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-10-0151MOTION for Extension of Time to submit one remaining part of his combined motion for summary judgment by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Combined Motion for Summary Judgment)(ztd) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-0452MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING ONLY Plaintiff's Motion for Extension to File Supplement to his Opposition and Combined Cross-Motion. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Supplement shall be filed by 10/12/2018. It is further ORDERED that the Supplement shall not exceed ten pages. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/4/2018. (dm) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental to opposition due by 10/12/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-0953RESPONSE re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (ztd) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-2654REPLY to opposition to motion re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-26MINUTE ORDER: The court takes notice that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time [51, 51-1] also contains his combined Motion for Summary Judgment/Opposition and corresponding exhibits, as well as two Motions to Strike, and two Motions for Discovery/In Camera Inspection. Notwithstanding the combined nature of the filing [51, 51-1], the court will address all of Plaintiff's motions therein. The court also acknowledges that Plaintiff filed a timely Supplemental Response to Summary Judgment 53 . Defendants filed a timely Reply 54 to Plaintiff's Opposition and Supplemental Response. There shall be no further briefing in this matter without leave of court. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to the Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/2018. (dm) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-1855MOTION for Leave to File by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Relpy)(ztd) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-1856MOTION for Court to Conduct In Camera Inspection to the 1994 CIA's Exhibit (C) by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (ztd) Modified on 1/7/2019 to delete pages that were adding in error (zrdj). (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-20MINUTE ORDER GRANTING only 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File his Reply to Defendant's Cross-Motion Nunc Pro Tunc. The court will consider Plaintiff's Reply despite its filing beyond the November 30, 2018 deadline. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to the Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/20/2018. (dm) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2057SURREPLY to re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (Nunc Pro Tunc pursuant to Minute Order filed 12/20/18) (ztd) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-03-3158MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING FBI's Motion for Summary Judgment 45 ; DENYING EOUSA's Motion for Summary Judgment 45 ; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part CIA's Motion for Summary Judgment 47 ; DENYING Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 51 ; DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Stone Declaration [51 at 33-6]; DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Hardy Declaration [51 at 37-40]; DENYING Plaintiff's First Motion for In Camera Review & Discovery [51 at 41-4]; DENYING Plaintiff's Second Motion for In Camera Review & Discovery [51 at 45-6]; DENYING Plaintiff's Third Motion for In Camera Review 56 . See document for further details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/2019. (dm) (Entered: 03/31/2019)
2019-03-3159ORDER GRANTING FBI's Motion for Summary Judgment 45 ; DENYING EOUSA's Motion for Summary Judgment 45 ; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part CIA's Motion for Summary Judgment 47 ; DENYING Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 51 ; DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Stone Declaration [51 at 33-6]; DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Hardy Declaration [51 at 37-40]; DENYING Plaintiff's First Motion for In Camera Review & Discovery [51 at 41-4]; DENYING Plaintiff's Second Motion for In Camera Review & Discovery [51 at 45-6]; DENYING Plaintiff's Third Motion for In Camera Review 56 . CIA shall file either a renewed motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, a report addressing the status of production and (if applicable) proposing a briefing schedule, on or before May 4, 2019. The motion or status report shall address FOIA/Privacy Act Request No. P-2014-00346. EOUSA shall file either a renewed motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, a report addressing the status of production and (if applicable) proposing a briefing schedule, on or before May 4, 2019. The motion or status report and address FOIA/Privacy Act Request Nos. FOIA-2014-02098, FOIA-2016-04133, and the unassigned Request dated September 30, 2015. Department of State shall file a report addressing the status of production and (if applicable) proposing a briefing schedule, on or before May 4, 2019. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/2019. (dm) (Entered: 03/31/2019)
2019-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/4/2019. CIA renewed motion for summary judgment due by 5/4/2019. (tb) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar