Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSIERRA CLUB v. JEWELL et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00110
Date Filed2017-01-17
Date Closed2017-07-24
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffSIERRA CLUB
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement at the Department of the Interior for records concerning fugitive dust generated by coal operations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and subsequently told the Sierra Club that it could not respond within the 20-day time limit. The Sierra Club inquired about the status of the request, but after the agency was unable to provide an estimated completion date, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSALLY JEWELL in her official Capacity as Secretary of the Interior
DefendantJOSEPH PIZARCHIK in his official capacity of Director of the Office of Surface Mining, Reclamation and Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-171COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4809016) filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Fabish, Zachary) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-17Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (md) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-182NOTICE of Corrected Complaint pursuant to Local Rule 5.1 by SIERRA CLUB (Fabish, Zachary) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-183SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to SALLY JEWELL, JOSEPH PIZARCHIK, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-184STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 18, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SALLY JEWELL served on 1/23/2017 (Fabish, Zachary) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOSEPH PIZARCHIK served on 1/23/2017 (Fabish, Zachary) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/25/2017. (Fabish, Zachary) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-308RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/24/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/23/2017. (See Docket Entry 6 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-219NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2110Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Notice (Other), 1 Complaint by SALLY JEWELL, JOSEPH PIZARCHIK (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-22MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Accordingly, the defendants shall, by April 24, 2017, file an answer. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 22, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 4/24/2017. (tg) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-04-2411Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by SALLY JEWELL, JOSEPH PIZARCHIK (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 11 Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Accordingly, the defendants shall, by May 24, 2017, file an answer, unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed by that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 25, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 5/24/2017. (tg) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-05-2312Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by SALLY JEWELL, JOSEPH PIZARCHIK (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-06-05MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 12 Third Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Accordingly, the defendants shall, by June 23, 2017, file an answer. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 5, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 6/23/2017. (tg) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-2313Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by SALLY JEWELL, JOSEPH PIZARCHIK (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-26MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 13 Fourth Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Accordingly, the defendants shall, by July 24, 2017, file an answer. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 26, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-2414STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal by SALLY JEWELL, JOSEPH PIZARCHIK. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-24MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of the parties' 14 Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal, DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 24, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff