Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00118
Date Filed2017-01-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of State asking for records on a variety on unrelated topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Department of State
2201 C Street, NW
Washington, DC 20520
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-181COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4811194) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for Defendant, # 4 Summons for US Attorney, # 5 Certificate Rule LCvR7.1)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (sb) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-23Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (sb) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment : # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-02-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/30/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2017. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/30/2017. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/22/2017 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-307NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Wynne Kelly (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-318ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-039ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 17, 2017. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 04/03/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-1710Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before July 17, 2017, which updates the court as to the status of document production. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/19/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-07-1711Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before October 16, 2017, which updates the court as to the status of document production. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/17/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines : Parties' Joint Status Report due by 10/16/17. (kk) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff