Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00121
Date Filed2017-01-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the agency's response to Russian interference in the 2016 election. EPIC also requested news media fee status and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Fee Category - Media or Educational, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-181COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4811409) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General for the United States, # 3 Summons Federal Bureau of Investigation, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-182Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-183NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-23Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-234SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-02-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/24/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/23/2017. (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/24/2017. (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 1/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-238ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-109ORDER, defendant's dispositive motions shall be filed within 10 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/9/17. (lcrcl1, ) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-2010Consent MOTION to Modify March 9, 2017 Order by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2711Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-0712ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc 10 Motion to Modify. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/6/17. (zlsj) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-1013SCHEDULING ORDER entered in light of 11 ; SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Joint Status Report due by 8/8/2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/6/17. (zlsj) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-05-1214MOTION to Compel Preservation by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-1915RESPONSE re 14 MOTION to Compel Preservation filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-2616REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION to Compel Preservation filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-3017ORDER denying 14 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/25/17. (lcrcl1, ) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-08-0818Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-1419SCHEDULING ORDER: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/12/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/15/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/5/2017. Replies due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/9/17. (lsj) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-10-0620MOTION to Clarify Scheduling Order by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-1221MOTION for Leave to File Ex Parte, In Camera Versions of the FBI's Summary Judgment Filings by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-1222MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Index of Exhibits, # 5 Hardy Declaration)(Merritt, Robert) (Attachment 5 replaced on 10/13/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-2623Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Leave to File Ex Parte, In Camera Versions of the FBI's Summary Judgment Filings filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-02Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Royce C. Lamberth is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-1524Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit 1-7, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-1525Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit 1-7, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the recent assignment of this case to Judge McFadden, the parties are advised that the pre-existing schedule for this case remains in effect. The parties shall comply with all deadlines as previously ordered. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/16/2017. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-3026Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-30MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its combined reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment by December 11, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its reply brief in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment by December 21, 2017.(lctnm1) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 12/11/2017. Plaintiff's reply in support of its Cross-Motion due by 12/21/2017. (hmc) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-1127RESPONSE re 24 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response To Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts Not In Dispute, # 2 Exhibit Second Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-1128REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response To Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute, # 2 Exhibit Second Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff