Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePRO PUBLICA, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00124
Date Filed2017-01-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPRO PUBLICA, INC.
PlaintiffVIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC
Case DescriptionThe Virginian-Pilot submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning correspondence with Hans Kang and Michael Peterson, both former employees of the VA and experts on the effects of Agent Orange and other toxins. The reporter from the Virginian-Pilot was working with a reporter from Pro Publica. Both the Virginian-Pilot and Pro Publica contacted the VA numerous times to inquire about the status of the request, including seeking help from the Office of Government Information Services. The Virginian-Pilot submitted a second FOIA request to VA for further correspondence involving Agent Orange. After the agency had failed to respond, the Virginian-Pilot once again asked for help from OGIS. After the agency failed to respond to either request, Pro Publica and the Virginian-Pilot filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4811949) filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Civil Cover Sheet, # 28 Summons to VA, # 29 Summons to U.S. Attorney for DC, # 30 Summons to U.S. Attorney General)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-192LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PRO PUBLICA, INC. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-193LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-194MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Declaration of Charles Ornstein, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Ornstein Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Ornstein Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Ornstein Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Ornstein Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Ornstein Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Ornstein Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Ornstein Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 8 to Ornstein Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 9 to Ornstein Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 10 to Ornstein Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 11 to Ornstein Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 12 to Ornstein Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 13 to Ornstein Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 14 to Ornstein Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 15 to Ornstein Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 16 to Ornstein Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 17 to Ornstein Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 18 to Ornstein Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 19 to Ornstein Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 20 to Ornstein Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 21 to Ornstein Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 22 to Ornstein Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 23 to Ornstein Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 24 to Ornstein Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 25 to Ornstein Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 26 to Ornstein Declaration, # 29 Exhibit 27 to Ornstein Declaration, # 30 Exhibit 28 to Ornstein Declaration, # 31 Exhibit 29 to Ornstein Declaration, # 32 Exhibit 30 to Ornstein Declaration, # 33 Exhibit 31 to Ornstein Declaration, # 34 Exhibit 32 to Ornstein Declaration, # 35 Exhibit 33 to Ornstein Declaration, # 36 Exhibit 34 to Ornstein Declaration, # 37 Exhibit 35 to Ornstein Declaration, # 38 Exhibit 36 to Ornstein Declaration, # 39 Exhibit 37 to Ornstein Declaration, # 40 Exhibit 38 to Ornstein Declaration, # 41 Exhibit 39 to Ornstein Declaration, # 42 Exhibit 40 to Ornstein Declaration, # 43 Exhibit 41 to Ornstein Declaration, # 44 Exhibit 42 to Ornstein Declaration, # 45 Exhibit 43 to Ornstein Declaration, # 46 Exhibit 44 to Ornstein Declaration, # 47 Exhibit 45 to Ornstein Declaration, # 48 Exhibit 46 to Ornstein Declaration, # 49 Exhibit 47 to Ornstein Declaration, # 50 Exhibit 48 to Ornstein Declaration, # 51 Exhibit 49 to Ornstein Declaration, # 52 Exhibit 50 to Ornstein Declaration, # 53 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-24Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-245SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-256MOTION for Leave to File Additional Declaration and Supplement to Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Wesley T. Carter, Major, USAF (Ret.), # 2 Exhibit B - Supplement to Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-25MINUTE ORDER directing, sua sponte, each party to file, by no later than noon on January 27, 2017, a pleading of not more than three pages addressing why the 4 request for preliminary injunction relief should not be consolidated with a merits determination pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a)(2). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/25/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-257CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC re 6 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Declaration and Supplement to Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction . (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/25/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/24/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-259RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-2510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 1/25/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Pleading Addressing Why The 4 Request For Preliminary Injunction Relief Should Not Be Consolidated With A Merits Determination Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 65(a)(2) by 1/27/2017. (mac) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-01-2711RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-2712NOTICE Defendant's Statement Regarding Consolidation of the Request for Preliminary Injunction with a Merits Determination by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-2713NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-2714NOTICE by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC re Order, 12 Notice (Other), 11 Response to Order of the Court (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-2715Case directly reassigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras as related to 16-cv-2462 (RC). Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-3016Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-30MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to 4 Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction on or before February 3, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/30/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-0317Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-1018REPLY to opposition to motion re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-17MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on 15 Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction on Friday, February 24, 2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/17/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-22Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/24/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-2319NOTICE of Appearance by Giang T. Ton-that on behalf of PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC (Ton-that, Giang) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-24Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Motion Hearing held on 2/24/2017 re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. Scheduling order to follow. (tj) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-2420ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/24/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-24Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-03-1021RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 20 Order filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: J. Horan Decl., Mar. 10, 2017)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-1522TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on February 24, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-17. Date of Issuance:March 15, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 4/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2017.(pk) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-1723RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 20 Order filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-2424ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/24/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-3125MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 1 Complaint,,, Defendant's Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-1426Memorandum in opposition to re 25 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 1 Complaint,,, Defendant's Answer filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-2127REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 1 Complaint,,, Defendant's Answer filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-2428NOTICE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS re 24 Order (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-2529TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on March 24, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-15. Date of Issuance:April 25, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia A Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 5/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2017.(pk) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 28 Notice Regarding the Court's March 24, 2017 Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the agency representative responsible for this matter shall attend the status hearing set for April 27, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/26/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-2630RESPONSE re 28 Notice (Other) by VA Regarding the Courts March 24, 2017 Order filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-2631STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-27MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Defendant's Motion to Hold Deadline: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before June 27, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/27/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-27SCHEDULING MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall respond to 31 Defendant's Status Report on or before May 4, 2017 and Defendant shall reply on or before May 11, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on May 18, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/27/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/4/2017 Replies due by 5/11/2017. (tj) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/27/2017, (tj) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-2832TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on April 27, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-36. Date of Issuance:April 28, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia A Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Tape Number: Patricia_Kaneshiro-Miller@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 5/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2017.(pk) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-0433RESPONSE re 31 Status Report filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-1134RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration J. Buck Decl., dated May 11, 2017)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1735MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support thereof , by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Interrogatories to VA, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Requests for Production to VA, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) Modified event title on 5/18/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-18MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a status update on or before May 25, 2017 addressing any additional resources allocated for FOIA processing. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file a comprehensive status report on or before June 16, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on June 22, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/18/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/18/17 : Status Conference held. Further Status Conference set for 6/22/17 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (Court Reporter : Pat Kaneshiro-Miller) (kk) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines : Defendant shall file a status update regarding additional resources allocated for FOIA processing by 5/25/17; Defendant's next comprehensive status report due by 6/16/17. (kk) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Update due by 5/25/2017. Joint Status Report due by 6/16/2017. Status Conference set for 6/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (hs) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-1936TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on May 18, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-36. Date of Issuance:May 19, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia A Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Tape Number: Patricia_Kaneshiro-Miller@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 6/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2017.(pk) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-2537STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-3138Memorandum in opposition to re 35 MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support thereof filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-0739REPLY to opposition to motion re 35 MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support thereof filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-1240ERRATA by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC 39 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-1641NOTICE of Filing of Declaration by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Buck, June 16, 2017)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-1942NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PRO PUBLICA, INC., VIRGINIAN-PILOT MEDIA COMPANIES, LLC. Attorney Giang T. Ton-that terminated. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-22MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its declarations addressing information technology issues on or before June 29, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file a comprehensive status report on or before July 24, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 27, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/22/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 6/22/2017. Declarations due 6/29/17; Status Report due by 7/24/2017; Next status conference set for 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras.). (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro Miller.) (tj) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-2743NOTICE of Change of Address by Seth A. Watkins (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-2744ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-2745NOTICE of Filing of Declaration by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Ramos, dated June 23, 2017)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff