Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00128
Date Filed2017-01-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a policy analyst at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Defense for records concerning the ThinThread Project, a data collection operation conducted by the National Security Agency in the 1990s, and the Trailblazer Project, a similar operation run by a NSA contractor. He also requested expedited processing. The agency denied his request for expedited processing, but after Eddington appealed the denial, the agency granted his request for expedited processing. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Eddington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-191COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons)(Gray, Karen) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-19Case Assigned to Judge Gladys Kessler. (md) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-24SUMMONS Not Issued as to OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney General (INCORRECT SUMMONS SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-252REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Defendant Office of Inspector General Department of Defense (Corrected) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON.(Gray, Karen) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-263SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (znmw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2017: # 1 Notice and Consent) (znmw). (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-02-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/30/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2017. (Gray, Karen) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-24Case randomly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge Gladys Kessler is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-275ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 27, 2017. (NS) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-016ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-027ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby set for April 12, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 28A. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/2/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-03Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 28A, before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (kt) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-228MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua Hart Burday, :Firm- Loevy & Loevy, :Address- 311 N. Aberdeen, Third Floor, Chicago, IL 60607. Phone No. - (312) 243-5900. Fax No. - (312) 423-5902 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4885349. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PATRICK EDDINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Joshua Hart Burday in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice)(Gray, Karen) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-23MINUTE ORDER: The 8 Motion for the Admission of Attorney Joshua Hart Burday as Counsel Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. Counsel shall register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/23/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-04-039NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-0410ORDER. The parties shall file the schedule not later than APRIL 18, 2017. The Court's 7 Order for Initial Scheduling Conference, and the Initial Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for April 12, 2017 at 10:00 A.M., are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/4/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-1811Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-2412Joint STATUS REPORT and Amended Joint Proposed Schedule by OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-2513SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/25/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff