Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES PARK POLICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00129
Date Filed2017-01-19
Date Closed2017-05-03
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Park Police for records concerning the number of employees at the Park Police offices in Washington, San Francisco, and New York, and a breakdown of the annual workload in each location. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES PARK POLICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES PARK POLICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4812177) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for Agency Defendant, # 3 Summons Summons for US Atty DC, # 4 Summons Summons for US Atty General)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-192Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-19Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES PARK POLICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/24/2017) (md). (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES PARK POLICE served on 1/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery Confirmation)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-315RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/30/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery Confirmation)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-316RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/30/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery Confirmation)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-227NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of UNITED STATES PARK POLICE (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-018MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES PARK POLICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-02MINUTE ORDER: If Plaintiff opposes Defendant's 8 Motion, the Court ORDERS that it shall file such opposition by March 3, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/2/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition due by 3/3/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-039RESPONSE re 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-03MINUTE ORDER granting in part Defendant's 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before March 15, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/3/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/15/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-1510ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES PARK POLICE.(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-16MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall meet, confer, and jointly propose a briefing schedule by March 30, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/16/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Briefing Schedule due by 3/30/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-3011MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-31MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 11 Meet and Confer Statement, the parties shall submit either a stipulation of dismissal or a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 21, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/31/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Stipulation Of Dismissal or Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/21/2017. (mac) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-0512NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Paula Naomi Dinerstein on behalf of PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY Substituting for attorney Laura Marie Colangelo Dumais (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-2113Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file stipulation of dismissal or proposed briefing schedule by UNITED STATES PARK POLICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-24MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a stipulation of settlement and dismissal or a proposed schedule for summary-judgment briefing on or before May 1, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/24/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Stipulation of settlement and dismissal or a proposed schedule for summary-judgment briefing on or before 5/1/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-05-0214STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by UNITED STATES PARK POLICE. (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-03MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 14 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/3/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff