Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALLIED PILOTS ASSOCIATION v. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00130
Date Filed2017-01-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffALLIED PILOTS ASSOCIATION
Case DescriptionThe Allied Pilots Association submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Aviation Administration for records of communications between Robert Neumeier, Assistant Principal Operations Inspector at the agency, and three American Airlines officials. The agency disclosed some records, with redactions made under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), and charged the Association $142.85. The Association believed there should be more records, but the agency told the Association it had disclosed all the records located. The Association filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Association filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-191COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4812221) filed by ALLIED PILOTS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Costle, Caroline) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-19Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sth) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-232SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney's Office (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-243REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by ALLIED PILOTS ASSOCIATION. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by ALLIED PILOTS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Summons to Fed. Aviation Admin.)(Costle, Caroline) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-244ERRATA by ALLIED PILOTS ASSOCIATION re 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Complaint with Parties' Addresses)(Costle, Caroline) Modified on 1/24/2017 to correct event (zrdj). (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-245SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-02-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/30/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2017. (Costle, Caroline) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/30/2017. (Costle, Caroline) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-068RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION served on 1/30/2017 (Costle, Caroline) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-279NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-2710Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-28MINUTE ORDER: Granting 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/28/17. (DJS) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/31/2017. (tb) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-3111ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than 4/21/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/3/17. (DJS) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-05ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 4/13/2017. Parties Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting due by 4/14/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb) Modified on 4/6/2017 (ztb). (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-06NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: The Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 4/13/2017. Parties Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting due by 4/14/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan docketed on 04/05/17 was entered in error and counsel should disregard this entry. (tb) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-2112Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-24MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 12 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by June 20, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and any combined cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by July 18, 2017. Defendant's reply and combined opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by August 23, 2017. Plaintiff's reply in further support of any cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by September 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/24/17. (DJS) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/20/2017. Cross Motion/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/18/2017. Reply/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/23/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/18/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-06-0113MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James P. Clark, :Firm- Law Offices of James P. Clark, PC, :Address- 256 Main St., Ste. 202, Northport, NY 11768. Phone No. - 631-261-1040. Fax No. - 631-956-9272 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4974234. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIED PILOTS ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Costle, Caroline) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-08MINUTE ORDER: Granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. James Patrick Clark is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/8/17. (DJS) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-1914Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Modify Remainder of Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-20MINUTE ORDER: Granting 14 Consent Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due July 27, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition and any combined cross-motion shall be filed by August 28, 2017. Defendant's reply and any combined opposition shall be filed by September 27, 2017. Plaintiff's reply in further support of any cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by October 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/20/17. (DJS) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 7/27/2017. Response and Cross Motion due by 8/28/2017. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 9/27/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 10/27/2017. (tb) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-07-2615Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Modify Remainder of Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-27MINUTE ORDER: Granting 15 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant's motion for summary judgment due October 4, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and any combined cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by November 8, 2017. Defendant's reply in further support of its motion for summary judgment and any combined opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by December 13, 2017. Plaintiff's reply in further support of any cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by January 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/27/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by 10/4/2017; Plaintiff's opposition and any combined cross-motion is due by 11/8/2017; Defendant's reply and combined opposition is due by 12/13/2017; Plaintiff's reply in support of any cross-motion is due by 1/17/2018. (jth) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-09-18Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-10-0416MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff