Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC RECORD MEDIA v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00142
Date Filed2017-01-23
Date Closed2017-03-08
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPUBLIC RECORD MEDIA
Case DescriptionPublic Record Media submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning mass collection programs conducted under specified statues, including the Privacy Act and the Electronic Communications Privacy Act. The Office of Information Policy acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Record Media filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4813820) filed by PUBLIC RECORD MEDIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Local Rule 7.1 Statement, # 4 Summons)(Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC RECORD MEDIA (zsb) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-24Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-02-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/30/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2017. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/30/17. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/30/2017 (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-03-017ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-01MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before March 16, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/1/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-078STIPULATION of Dismissal by PUBLIC RECORD MEDIA. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff