Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00153
Date Filed2017-01-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionReporter Jason Leopold and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and a number of other agencies for records concerning Jeff Sessions, nominated by President Trump to serve as Attorney General, the Judicial Crisis Network, and confirmsessions.com. The requests also asked for expedited processing. The Department of the Army and the Department of State acknowledged receipt of their request, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Leopold and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantEQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantNATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Washington, DC 20511
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-241COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4815929) filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO, JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-24Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-242SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-263RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/26/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/25/2017. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-02-174NOTICE of Appearance by Nikhel Sus on behalf of All Defendants (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-175AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO, JASON LEOPOLD.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-176REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 5 Amended Complaint, filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO, JASON LEOPOLD. Related document: 5 Amended Complaint, filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-217SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (jf) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-03-208MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 5 , MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION, NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Bolling, # 2 Declaration Herrington, # 3 Declaration Brinkmann, # 4 Declaration Garner, # 5 Declaration Kornmeier, # 6 Declaration Sibley, # 7 Declaration Ovall, # 8 Declaration Stein, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-04-109STIPULATION re 8 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-17MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice 8 Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation 9 . The the Freedom of Information Act requests that are the subject of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint 5 are hereby superseded by the requests set for in Paragraph I of the parties' Joint Stipulation. One or more of the Defendants will make an initial production of documents responsive to the FOIA requests outlined in Paragraph I of the Stipulation within two weeks of entry of this Order. Defendants will thereafter continue to make productions on a rolling basis until August 28, 2017, which will be the production completion date for all Defendants except for the Department of State. Department of State will provide Plaintiffs its production completion date within eight weeks of entry of this Order. The parties shall file a joint status report - along with a proposed order - by September 1, 2017, providing their positions on how the case should proceed, including whether a summary judgment briefing schedule should be set. Nothing in this Order shall be construed to support Plaintiffs' eligibility or entitlement to attorneys' fees or costs. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/17/17. (DJS) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff