Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00154
Date Filed2017-01-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the agency's land acquisitions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Cause of Action Institute agreed to narrow the scope of its request. The agency provided four spreadsheets obtained from its database, but beyond that, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-241COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4816701) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons BLM, # 12 Summons AG, # 13 Summons Clerk)(Steven, Lee) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-242Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-24Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 1/30/2017 (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-315RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/30/2017. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-316RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/30/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2017. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-287NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-02-288Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-02-28MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer/Response on or before March 15, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/28/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-02-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/15/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-159ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly propose a briefing schedule by March 30, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/16/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Briefing Schedule due by 3/30/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-3010Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-31MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' joint request, the Court ORDERS that they shall file a further status report and/or proposed briefing schedule by May 26, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/31/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/26/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-05-2511Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-26MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they shall submit a further such report by August 4, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/26/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/4/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-07-2712Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-28MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before September 8, 2017, to apprise the Court of the status of the production and, if any issues remain at that time, to propose a summary judgment motion briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/28/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/8/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-09-0813Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-11MINUTE ORDER: The Court adopts the parties' proposal in their 13 Status Report, and ORDERS that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before October 6, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/11/17. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-10-0414Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court adopts the parties' 14 proposal. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before November 6, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/5/17. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff