Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00157
Date Filed2017-01-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records reflecting the number of Refugee Travel Loans provided by the Bureau for Population, Refugees and Migration to the International Organization for Migration, the number of loans defaulted, and the amount of money written off because of defaulted loans. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4816998) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of State)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-24Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (md) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-02-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/30/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/30/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-225NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-226Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-23MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file a response to 1 plaintiff's complaint by March 15, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/23/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-157ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-158ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before April 12, 2017. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/15/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-289ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/21/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/20/2017. (jf) Modified on 3/29/2017 (zjf). (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-29NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 9 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and will be refiled in the correct case (jf) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before 4/12/2017. (jth) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-1210STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-14MINUTE ORDER. In light of 10 defendant's status report, defendant shall file a status report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff by May 12, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/14/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-05-1211STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of 11 defendant's status report, defendant must issue its final determination to plaintiff regarding plaintiff's FOIA request by May 26, 2017. The parties shall file a joint status report by June 23, 2017, informing the Court of any remaining issues and a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if needed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/12/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-12Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/23/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-06-2312Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff