Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00186
Date Filed2017-01-30
Date Closed2017-04-30
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffKEN VOGEL
PlaintiffJOSH GERSTEIN
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project, Ken Vogel and Josh Gerstein of Politico submitted a FOIA request to the Secret Service for records concerning any security-sharing issues between the Secret Service and President Donald Trump's personal security team. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but had not responded before JMP and Gerstein filed suit. JMP, Vogel, and Gerstein also submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Homeland Security for the records relating to security-sharing issues. After hearing nothing further from either agency, JMP and Gerstein filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-301COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4823904) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, JOSH GERSTEIN, KEN VOGEL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons DHS, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-302LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, JOSH GERSTEIN, KEN VOGEL (zsb) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-30Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-303SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-03-034MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JOSH GERSTEIN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KEN VOGEL (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-03MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 4 motion for leave to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket the [4-2] First Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/3/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-035AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, JOSH GERSTEIN, KEN VOGEL.(td) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-106NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-177ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. Related document: 5 Amended Complaint filed by JOSH GERSTEIN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KEN VOGEL.(Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-17MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiffs on or before April 14, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/17/2017.(lcabj3) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-04-148MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-289NOTICE of Concession by JOSH GERSTEIN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KEN VOGEL (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-2810ORDER. With the 9 consent of the plaintiffs, this case is dismissed with prejudice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/28/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff