Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Housing And Urban Development
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2017cv00338
Date Filed2017-01-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy C. Batten, Sr
PlaintiffSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Southeastern Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for communications between HUD and the Cities of Nashville and Franklin concerning affordable housing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Housing And Urban Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-301COMPLAINT, filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.; and Summon(s) issued. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-6942158.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -A, # 2 Exhibit -B, # 3 Exhibit -C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-302Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of Housing And Urban Development. (Attachments: # 1 U. S. Attorney, # 2 U.S. Attorney General)(eop) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-303Certificate of Interested Persons by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-01Clerks Notation re 3 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-03-034AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Certificate of Interested Persons , as to U.S. HUD; U.S. Attorney General; U.S. Attorney NDGA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. HUD, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-065ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by United States Department of Housing And Urban Development. Discovery ends on 8/3/2017.(Mendel, Gabriel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-066INSTRUCTIONS to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 3/3/17. (jlm) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-167STIPULATION of Dismissal by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff