Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00192
Date Filed2017-01-31
Date Closed2017-07-25
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning any attempts to obtain diplomatic passports for Douglas Band, Justin Cooper, and a third individual as referenced in a July 2009 email exchange between Band and former Deputy Chief of Staff Huma Abedin. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-311COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4825552) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of State)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-312LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-31Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zsb) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/13/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/13/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/13/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-03-155ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-166ORDER requiring that the parties submit a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions by not later than April 21, 2017. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/16/17. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-16Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall confer and submit by not later than 4/21/2017 a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions. (kt) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-04-217NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Wynne P. Kelly (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-218Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and submit by not later than June 5, 2017, a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions to resolve this matter. In the event the parties cannot agree, separate proposals shall be filed by that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/26/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-26Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall confer and submit by not later than June 5, 2017, a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions to resolve this matter. (jth) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/5/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-06-019MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 defendant's motion to extend time to file proposed briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer and submit by not later than June 9, 2017, a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions to resolve this matter. In the event the parties cannot agree, separate proposals shall be filed by that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/1/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/9/2017. (tb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-0610MOTION for Briefing Schedule Jointly Filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) Modified event title on 6/7/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' joint proposed briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by not later than July 7, 2017; plaintiff shall file its opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment by not later than August 7, 2017; and defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion by not later than August 28, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/6/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 7/7/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/7/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/28/2017. (tb) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-07-0611MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 defendant's motion to stay, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that proceedings in this action are STAYED pending further order of the Court; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report by not later than August 7, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/6/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2017.(tb) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-2412STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff