Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00205
Date Filed2017-01-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's search and processing of a previous FOIA request submitted by Judicial Watch in May 2014. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-311COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4826131) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOS)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-312LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-31Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (jd) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/13/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/13/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/13/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-225NOTICE of Errata by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,,, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General,,, Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant,, (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/13/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/13/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-157NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Prince on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-158ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 FOIA Request Letter)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-15MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a Complaint and an Answer. Since the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by March 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/15/2017. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 3/29/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-289Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-06-0510STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants Submission Regarding Processing Rates in Other Recent FOIA Cases, American Center for Law and Justice v. Dept of State)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-0511STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court has fully considered the parties' 10 , 11 Status Reports. It is hereby ORDERED that the State Department shall review and complete processing of a minimum of 300 pages of documents every four weeks. It is further ORDERED that the Department shall file a status report every four weeks to update the Court on the pace of its production. The Court also encourages the Plaintiff to prioritize the categories of documents that are subject to processing and orders the Defendant to produce documents in that priority to the extent practicable. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/30/2017. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-1012STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-08-0713STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-09-0614STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-10-0415STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-3116STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-2917STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff