Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPEAKING TRUTH TO POWER v. UNITED STATES AIR FORCE GLOBAL STRIKE COMMAND et al
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2017cv00505
Date Filed2017-02-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT
PlaintiffSPEAKING TRUTH TO POWER
Case DescriptionSpeaking Truth to Power submitted a FOIA request to the Air Force Global Strike Command for records concerning a report prepared for President Obama assessing the capability of a rogue actor to hack into the U.S. nuclear arsenal and launch an attack. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and Speaking Truth to Power had various contacts with the agency concerning the processing of the request. However, after the agency failed to respond, Speaking Truth to Power filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantUNITED STATES AIR FORCE GLOBAL STRIKE COMMAND
DefendantUSSTRATCOMMAND
DefendantUS DEPT. OF AIR FORCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES AIR FORCE GLOBAL STRIKE COMMAND, US DEPT. OF AIR FORCE, USSTRATCOMMAND ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 154304.), filed by SPEAKING TRUTH TO POWER.(gs) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-03Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES AIR FORCE GLOBAL STRIKE COMMAND, US DEPT. OF AIR FORCE, USSTRATCOMMAND, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 4 Given to Counsel, 1 Given to AUSA on 2/3/17. (gs) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-062Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, ) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-203AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General of the United States; US Department of Air Force; US Air Force Global Strike; USSTRATCOMMAND by Certified Mail on 2/17/2017 (ZACHER, JULES) (Entered: 02/20/2017)
2017-03-074MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint filed by UNITED STATES AIR FORCE GLOBAL STRIKE COMMAND, US DEPT. OF AIR FORCE, USSTRATCOMMAND.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(CHERICO, COLIN) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-075ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD, IS GRANTED. THE RESPONSE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS IS EXTENDED FOR 30 DAYS AND SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE APRIL 7, 2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/7/17.3/7/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-04-056ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES AIR FORCE GLOBAL STRIKE COMMAND, US DEPT. OF AIR FORCE, USSTRATCOMMAND. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(CHERICO, COLIN) Modified on 4/6/2017 (tjd). (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-067ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/25/2017 AT 2:00 P.M., IN CHAMBERS, ON THE FIFTH FLOOR, ROOM 5614, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILA., PA, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/6/17. 4/7/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-128NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO APRIL 24, 2017 AT 3:00 PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT.(kf, ) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-219Report Of Rule 26(f) Report by UNITED STATES AIR FORCE GLOBAL STRIKE COMMAND, US DEPT. OF AIR FORCE, USSTRATCOMMAND. (CHERICO, COLIN) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-2410Minute Entry/Report of Pretrial Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT on 4/24/17. (kw, ) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-2511SCHEDULING ORDER THAT DEFTS SHALL PRODUCE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ON OR BEFORE 6/23/2017. ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/22/2017. BOTH PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY 10/6/2017. BOTH PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSES ON OR BEFORE 10/20/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/24/17. 4/25/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-09-1112First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SPEAKING TRUTH TO POWER. Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(ZACHER, JULES) Modified on 9/13/2017 (tjd). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1113Supplemental to 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SPEAKING TRUTH TO POWER. Exhibit, Proposed Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(ZACHER, JULES) Modified on 9/13/2017 (tjd, ). Modified on 9/13/2017 (tjd). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff