Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHAPMAN v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00254
Date Filed2017-02-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffROBERT CHAPMAN
Case DescriptionRobert Chapman submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the correction of legal and mathematical errors in tax forms and instructions. The agency asked him to narrow his request, which he did. The agency then estimated that the cost of processing the request would be $2,378. The fee issue had not been resolved by the time Chapman filed suit. Chapman also submitted a second FOIA request concerning his time when he was an employee at the agency. The agency indicated that it would need more time to respond, but after hearing nothing further from the agency on either request, Chapman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-081COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616082866) filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-08SUMMONS (3) Issued as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-132GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/13/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-03-023MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 4/15/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/07/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-10SUMMONS REISSUED as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (sth) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/13/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/13/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2017.) (jf) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-105AFFIDAVIT of Service re 1 Complaint by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (jf) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-04-076WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 7 ......MOTION for Protective Order by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Joseph Hunsader, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) Modified on 4/11/2017 (jf). (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-107NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-10MINUTE ORDER. This Court ordinarily permits discovery in FOIA cases only after the government agency responding to the FOIA request has moved for summary judgment. The Court has reviewed the written statements that the parties have submitted in advance of the telephonic discovery conference that the Court scheduled for April 11, 2017, and it sees no reason to deviate from that ordinary practice at this time. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the discovery conference scheduled for April 11, 2017, is CANCELLED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's premature Request for Production of Documents, dated March 14, 2017, shall be deemed WITHDRAWN, along with any other outstanding discovery requests that Plaintiff has propounded on Defendant in this case, and as a result, Defendant is not required to respond to those requests at this time. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any additional discovery requests that Plaintiff wishes to propound prior to the submission of Defendant's summary judgment motion shall not be served on Defendant unless Plaintiff first seeks leave to serve the discovery request by filing a motion with the Court that demonstrates good cause for the otherwise premature request. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/10/2017. (lckbj3) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-148ANSWER to 1 Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-209MOTION to Amend/Correct Minute Order filed on 04/10/2017 by ROBERT CHAPMAN (jf) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-2810ORDER DENYING 9 Motion to Alter or Amend the Courts Minute Order and REFERRING case to a Magistrate Judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerk's Office, for Full Case Management, up to and excluding Trial. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/28/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-28CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for Full Case Management up to and excluding trial. (jd) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-1811MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROBERT CHAPMAN (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit and Exhibits)(jf) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-1812MOTION for Sanctions by ROBERT CHAPMAN (jf) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-2313Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Sanctions filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-05-2514MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment [Dtk Nos 11-12] by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) Modified on 5/25/2017 (zrdj). (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-25MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed 14 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 5/25/2017. (lcdar2) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-3015MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion to Schedule Status Conference by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph). Added MOTION to Schedule Status Conference on 5/31/2017 (td). (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-3016REPLY to opposition re 12 MOTION for Sanctions filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (jf) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-05-3117Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion to Schedule Status Conference MOTION for Order filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (jf) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0718REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion to Schedule Status Conference MOTION for Order filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-1219AFFIDAVIT re 18 Reply to opposition to Motion, Amended Joseph Hunsader Declaration in support of stay of summary judgment briefing by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-2920NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel from July 3 to 7 by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-3021SUPPLEMENT to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (jf) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-3022MOTION for Discovery by ROBERT CHAPMAN (jf) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-30MINUTE ORDER granting in part 15 Defendant's Motion to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion and to Schedule Status Conference. Defendant's unopposed request to schedule a status conference is GRANTED. A status conference is hereby scheduled for Friday, July 21, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Further consideration of Defendant's Motion to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion is stayed until the parties appear before the undersigned for the aforementioned status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/30/2017. (lcdar2) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-30Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for Friday, July 21, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar2) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-1423RESPONSE re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 22 MOTION for Discovery (response to Supplement [Dkt. #21] and therefore in opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. #11] filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-2024REPLY to opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (jf) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-21Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Hearing held on 7/21/2017. Defendant shall submit to Plaintiff the exact fee amount in accordance with applicable statutes and regulations by 7/26/2017. Stay of Briefing on Summary Judgment extended to 8/14/2017. Defendant shall file either a notice that all responsive, non-exempt documents have been produced or a motion, supported in accordance with the statutes for a further stay by 8/25/2017. Status Hearing/Scheduling Conference and Hearing on any Motion for Stay set for 9/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Court Reporter FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [10:10:07 - 10:50:16; 11:01:35 - 11:11:56]; Plaintiff: Robert Chapman - Pro Se; Defense Attorney: Joseph Hunsader. (cal) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-2125SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 07/21/2017. (lcdar2) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-2626NOTICE of Defendant's compliance with July 21, 2017, Minute Order by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-08-07MINUTE ORDER: Status/Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for Thursday, September 21, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby rescheduled for 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. PLEASE NOTE THE CHANGE IN TIME. (lcdar2) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-0727MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (jf) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-0728MOTION in Limine by ROBERT CHAPMAN (jf) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-1029TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson held on July 21, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-33. Date of Issuance: August 10, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 8/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2017.(Dickman, Janice) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-1430Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Count II of the Complaint ("Employment Request" filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Affidavit of Sarah Tate Re: Employment Request)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-1431Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of the Complaint ("Forms-Correction Request") filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Statement of Facts Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Summary Judgment)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-1432MOTION for Extension of Time to File of One Day for Filing of Declaration in Support of Opposition to Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-1533Memorandum in opposition to re 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File of One Day for Filing of Declaration in Support of Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (jf) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of the time of day in which this minute order is entered, Defendant's 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File is hereby GRANTED through Wednesday, August 16, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/15/2017. (lcdar2) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1634NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Minute Order of August 15, 2017 by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Attachment A (Part 1) -- Declaration of Sarah Tate Re: Forms-Correction Request, # 2 Exhibit Attachment A (Part 2) -- Tate Declaration Exhibits A to O, # 3 Memorandum in Support Attachment B -- (Revised) Opposition Memorandum to Summ. Judg. on Count I ("Forms-Correction Request"), # 4 Statement of Facts Attachment C -- (Revised) Opposition to Undisputed Facts)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-1635Memorandum in opposition to re 28 MOTION in Limine filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-1836REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I and Count II of Complaint filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Reply)(td) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-1837REPLY to opposition to motion re 28 MOTION in Limine filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (td) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-1838RESPONSE to Defendant's Asserted Additional Facts filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (td) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-2539MOTION for Scheduling Order Pursuant to Minute Order of July 21, 2017 by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Hearing Transcript (July 21, 201&), # 2 Exhibit B -- Plaintiff Email (May 30, 2017), # 3 Exhibit C -- Joint Status Report in ACLJ v. Dep't of State, # 4 Affidavit Sarah Tate Declaration in Support of Entry of Scheduling Order, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph). Added MOTION to Stay on 8/28/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-09-0740Memorandum in opposition to re 39 MOTION for Scheduling Order Pursuant to Minute Order of July 21, 2017 MOTION to Stay filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(jf) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-1441REPLY to opposition to motion re 39 MOTION for Scheduling Order Pursuant to Minute Order of July 21, 2017 MOTION to Stay filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-1542NOTICE by ROBERT CHAPMAN re [39-4] Declaration of Sarah Tate in Support of Proposed Scheduling Order (jf) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-2043MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re 41 REPLY to opposition to motion re 39 MOTION for Scheduling Order Pursuant to Minute Order of July 21, 2017 by ROBERT CHAPMAN (jf) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-21Set/Reset Hearings: Status Hearing/Scheduling Conference and Hearing on any Motion for Stay set for 9/21/2017 at 2:00 PM has been RESCHEDULED to 9/26/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (cal) Modified on 9/21/2017 (cal). (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-22MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 09/22/2017. (lcdar3, ) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-2244SURREPLY to re 39 MOTION for Scheduling Order Pursuant to Minute Order of July 21, 2017 MOTION to Stay filed by ROBERT CHAPMAN. (See Docket Entry 43 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-26Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status, Scheduling, and Motion Hearing held on 9/26/2017. Arguments concerning Motions 11 , 12 , 15 , 22 , 28 , and 39 taken under advisement and further Order to be issued by the Court. Court Reporter FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [2:01:48 - 3:00:17]; Plaintiff's Counsel: Robert Chapman - Pro Se; Defense Counsel: Joseph Hunsader and David Skinner. (cal) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-10-1245ORDER granting in part 39 Defendant's Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order and Entry of Stay of Further Motion Practice; denying without prejudice 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying without prejudice 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery; denying without prejudice 28 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; denying as moot 15 Defendant's Motion to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion and to Schedule Status Conference; Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Hearing and Scheduling Conference is set for 1/4/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 10/12/2017. (lcdar3) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff