Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIsreal v. Holbrook et al
DistrictSouthern District of Ohio
CityColumbus
Case Number2:2017cv00116
Date Filed2017-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Edmund A. Sargus
PlaintiffMichael Isreal
Case DescriptionMichael Isreal requested records filed with the court of common pleas. Judge Michael Holbrook rejected Isreal's request and instead sent the case to the court of appeals. Isreal then filed suit. Isreal may have a claim on Ohio's public records act, but has no claim under the federal FOIA.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantJudge Michael Holbrook
DefendantMaryellen O'Shaughnessy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-071COMPLAINT against Michael Holbrook, Maryellen O'Shaughnessy, filed by Michael Isreal. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (agm) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-07Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 200COL046040. (agm) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-072Summons Issued as to Michael Holbrook, Maryellen O'Shaughnessy. (agm) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-143CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendants by certified mail. (ew) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-234SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Michael Holbrook. Michael Holbrook served on 2/15/2017, answer due 3/8/2017. (agm) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-025AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michael Isreal against Michael Holbrook & Maryellen O'Shaughnessy. (er) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-076MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 3/31/2017) by Defendants Michael Holbrook, Maryellen O'Shaughnessy. (Humphrey, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-317RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Michael Isreal. (agm) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-05-168REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Michael Holbrook and Maryellen O'Shaughnessy in that it is RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 5/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/16/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-06-169MOTION for 30 Day Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Michael Isreal. (agm) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-2010ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Responses due by 7/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 6/20/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines as to 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Michael Holbrook, Maryellen O'Shaughnessy. Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2017 (agm) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-0111ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/30/17. (jcw) (Entered: 07/01/2017)
2017-07-1212OBJECTION to 8 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Michael Isreal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (kdp) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-1713OBJECTION to 8 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Michael Isreal. (kdp) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff