Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00269
Date Filed2017-02-13
Date Closed2018-01-18
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC.
PlaintiffDELCIANNA J. WINDERS
PlaintiffPHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE
PlaintiffBORN FREE USA
PlaintiffMASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS
PlaintiffBEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT
Case DescriptionPeople for the Ethical Treatment of Animals and several other organizations filed suit challenging a decision by the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service at the Department of Agriculture to remove records concerning its oversight of the Animal Welfare Act from its website and require FOIA requests to obtain access to such records. PETA and the other organization argued that APHIS already had a substantial backlog of FOIA requests and requiring them to go through FOIA would put severe limitations on their ability to access information related to AWA.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [45]
FOIA Project Annotation: In ruling that the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service has now reposted redacted versions of the records it had taken down because of privacy concerns, Judge Christopher Cooper has resolved a suit brought by PETA challenging the agency's decision to remove the records in the first place. Cooper found that PETA had not shown that the agency was required to post the records under Section (a)(2)'s affirmative disclosure provisions, particularly the provision requiring agencies to make available frequently requested records. At the beginning of the Trump administration APHIS started removing records pertaining to a variety of animal welfare laws, resulting in a number of suits brought by advocacy organizations challenging the action. Although such organizations assumed this was the first shoe to drop in an expected policy resulting in less public information, the APHIS move seems to have had more to do with the agency's concern that it was making too much personal information about family-owned businesses available. As a result of that process, APHIS reposted inspection reports but did not repost animal inventories that had previously accompanied those reports. Cooper indicated that the agency had reposted three of the four categories of records that PETA sought. As to those categories of records, Cooper noted that "in light of this fact, there is no further meaningful relief that the Court can grant as to PETA's request for injunctive relief. As such, that request is moot as to any reposted record." PETA argued that its request for declaratory relief to force APHIS to continue to post the records was not moot because the agency could choose to remove the records again. But Cooper noted that "given the temporary, one-time nature of the Department's removal of the records, it is reasonably certain that the Department will not remove these records again." Cooper acknowledged that PETA could still challenge the agency failure to repost the animal inventories. He pointed out, however, that PETA needed to show that the animal inventories fell within the frequently requested category for disclosure. PETA argued that "because the records were previously posted on APHIS's website, they must be records within the scope of the reading room provision." Cooper responded that "but that is not necessarily so. An agency could clearly decide to post a wider swath of records than obligated to under FOIA: for instance, an agency could preemptively post a record that has never been requested (and thus is not a frequently requested record under the statute) but that it anticipates will be requested repeatedly." He added that "the Court does not agree that merely because a record has been posted on an agency's website, the agency was required to post that record under FOIA."
Issues: Affirmative disclosure, Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to State a Claim
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4839746) filed by PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J WINDERS, BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-132Corporate Disclosure Statement by PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC.. (Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-133Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT. (Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-134Corporate Disclosure Statement by Born Free USA. (Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-135Corporate Disclosure Statement by MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS. (Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-136Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE. (Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-13Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (sb) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-137SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-03-078NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bryce on behalf of All Defendants (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-209MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2110Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC.. (Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-2111REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-22MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file an Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, on or by April 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/22/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-22***Deadlines terminated. Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/24/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-04-1812MOTION for Discovery by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-2413MOTION to Dismiss by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-2814Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION for Discovery by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-0115Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery on or by May 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Plaintiffs' consent Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule shall be amended as follows: Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or by June 1, 2017, and Defendants shall file their reply on or by June 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery due by 5/16/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2017. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-0416NOTICE of Appearance by Anjali Motgi on behalf of All Defendants (Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-1117Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Discovery filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1718Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-17MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to file a Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motion for leave to take discovery on or by June 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/17/17. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motion for leave to take discovery due by 6/6/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-06-0119Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Delcianna Winders, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Shea)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0620REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Discovery filed by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-1921Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William Nicholas Lawton, :Firm- Meyer Glitzenstein & Eubanks, :Address- 4115 Wisconsin Ave., N.W. Suite 210. Phone No. - 202-588-5206 xt 107. Fax No. - 202-588-5049 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4997669. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified to add extension on 6/20/2017 (td). (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-2022Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-22MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/22/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-22MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule be amended as follows: Defendants' reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss shall be due on or by June 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/22/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-2923REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-0324Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Plaintiffs' Proposed Surreply, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-2525NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USDA Letter (July 18, 2017), # 2 Exhibit Recent Decision)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-2826RESPONSE re 25 to Plaintiffs' "Notice of Supplemental Authority" filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) Modified to add link on 7/31/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-0727NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-1428ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Permit Filiing of Supplemental Declaration Regarding Additional Factual Information Recently Provided by Defendants That is Relevat to the Issues Before the Court by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified on 8/15/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-1429ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Permit a Supplemental Declaration Regarding Additional Factual Information Recently Provided by Defendants that is Relevant to the Issues Before the Court by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified on 8/15/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-1430MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration Regarding Additional Factual Information Recently Provided by Defendants that is Relevant to the Issues Before the Court by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified event title on 8/15/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-15NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entries 28 MOTION to Permit 29 MOTION to Permit were entered in error as incomplete; the motion is refiled correctly as Docket Entry 30 . (znmw) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1631NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-1732RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS re 31 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Meyer, Katherine) Modified event title on 8/18/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1733Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-21MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to 30 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration. Defendants' response is now due by 9/4/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/21/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-09-0534RESPONSE re 30 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-1135REPLY to opposition to motion re 30 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Declaration filed by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1136NOTICE THAT DEFENDANTS HAVE FINISHED THEIR REVIEW OF MATERIALS POSTED IN THE ELECTRONIC READING ROOM AND HENCE THERE IS NO BASIS FOR DEFENDANTS' ARGUMENT THAT THE ISSUES PRESENTED ARE NOT RIPE FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1837RESPONSE re 36 to Plaintiffs' "Notice" Regarding Additional Posting of Materials filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) Modified to add link on 9/19/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-10-1138NOTICE of Supplemental Authority and Exhibit by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Recent Opinion, # 2 Exhibit Email)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified on 10/12/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-1639RESPONSE to 38 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority and Exhibit filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) Modified to add linkage on 10/17/2017 (ztd). (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-11-27MINUTE ORDER: In light of 36 , 37 the parties' filings on the federal defendants' completion of the review of the reading room documents, the federal defendants are hereby ORDERED to file a report with the Court clarifying the current posting status of the categories of records sought by the plaintiffs by December 4, 2017. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file any response to this status report within seven days thereafter. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/27/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/4/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-12-0440RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-1141RESPONSE Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Report to the Court by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS re 40 Response to Order of the Court (Meyer, Katherine) Modified event title on 12/12/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-1342NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-1843NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Authority by BEAGLE FREEDOM PROJECT, BORN FREE USA, MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS re 42 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-01-1844ORDER granting 13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, denying as moot 12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery, granting 24 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Surreply, and denying 30 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be granted, that Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery be denied as moot, that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Surreply be granted, and that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration be denied. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/18/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-1845MEMORANDUM OPINION re 44 Order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, denying as moot Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery, granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Surreply, and denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/18/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff