Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00272
Date Filed2017-02-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning investigations of FEMA administrator Craig Fugate for solicitation of prostitution. Judicial Watch also included a Privacy Act waiver for Aubree Allen, the alleged victim of Fugate's misconduct. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-131COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4840414) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Homeland Security)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-132LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-13Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sth) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-143ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) Modified on 2/15/2017 (jd). (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-154ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 15, 2017. (NS) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-15NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Incorrect summons were issued. re 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error. (jd) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-155SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/27/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/29/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/27/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 2/27/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-077NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-218MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Or , MOTION to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff