Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00276
Date Filed2017-02-13
Date Closed2017-08-14
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army for records concerning the use of heroin and other opiates by U.S. troops in Afghanistan and veterans of the Afghan war. Judicial Watch also sent its request to the U.S. Army Crime Records Center. The Crime Records Center told Judicial Watch it could not search its records based on a topic because they were filed by personal identifiers. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal of the Crime Center's decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4840928) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Defense)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-132LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-14Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (md) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-234MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric W. Lee, :Firm- Judicial Watch, Inc., :Address- 425 Third Street, SW, Ste 800, Washington, DC 20024. Phone No. - (202) 646-5172. Fax No. - (202) 646-7199 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4853077. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric W. Lee, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-24MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Allow Eric W. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Eric W. Lee is admitted pro hac vice in this matter for the purpose of representing the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 24, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-03-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/27/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/29/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/27/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/3/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-076NOTICE of Appearance by Derrick Wayne Grace on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Grace, Derrick) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-217Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-228AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-23MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before April 28, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report updating the Court as to the status of this case on or before May 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 23, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-04-079GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 7, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-2810ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Related document: 8 Amended Complaint filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Grace, Derrick) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-2611Joint STATUS REPORT (2nd) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Second Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report updating the Court as to the status of this case on or before July 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 30, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2017 (hs) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-2712NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shanna Laura Cronin on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Derrick Grace (Cronin, Shanna) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-07-2513Joint STATUS REPORT (3rd) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Third Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report updating the Court as to the status of this case on or before August 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 26, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/24/2017 (zhs) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-08-1114STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 14, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff