Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSmith v. United States Agency for International Development
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2017cv00741
Date Filed2017-02-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Maria-Elena James
PlaintiffMatt Smith
Case DescriptionMatt Smith, a reporter for the Center for Investigative Reporting, submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Agency for International Development for communications between staff members in Malawi and organizations belonging to the Humana People to People movement. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and placed Smith in the news media fee category. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Smith filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Agency for International Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-141COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. Section 552 et seq. against United States Agency for International Development ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11157173.). Filed byMatt Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/14/2017) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-142Proposed Summons. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/14/2017) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-143Certificate of Interested Entities by Matt Smith re 2 Proposed Summons, 1 Complaint, (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/14/2017) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-154Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/1/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-155Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) Modified on 2/15/2017 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-156Summons Issued as to United States Agency for International Development, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-237NOTICE by Matt Smith re 3 Certificate of Interested Entities, 1 Complaint, 6 Summons Issued as to USA Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Original Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/23/2017) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-068CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matt Smith.. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/6/2017) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-179Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re 1 Complaint, re 6 Summons Issued as to USA filed by Matt Smith. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/17/2017) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-2010ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Agency for International Development. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 3/20/2017) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-04-2611STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference and Exempt Case From Initial Disclosure Requirements of Rule 26(f) filed by Matt Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Thomas R. Burke in Support of Joint Stipulation to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference and Exempt Case from Initial Disclosure Requirements of Rule 26(f), # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Concerning Stipulation to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference and Exempt Case from Initial Disclosure Requirements of Rule 26(f))(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 4/26/2017) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-2612NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Charney, Brendan) (Filed on 4/26/2017) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-2613ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Charney, Brendan) (Filed on 4/26/2017) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-2614ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 11 Stipulation to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference and Exempt Case From Initial Disclosure Requirements of Rule 26.. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-2815ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on May 12, 2017 at 12:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-1216ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 5/12/2017 with Tamara Lange. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 7/11/2017 at 9:30 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-07-1017NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Pamela T Johann (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 7/10/2017) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1118ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Tamara Lange on July 11, 2017. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on September 7, 2017, at 10:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1119STATUS REPORT (Joint) by United States Agency for International Development. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 7/11/2017) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1220STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 9/11/2017. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/12/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-08-1521CLERK'S NOTICE: Directing Defendants to file consent or declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by August 25, 2017. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1522CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Agency for International Development.. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 8/15/2017) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff