Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBONFILIO v. OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00282
Date Filed2017-02-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffRONALD J. BONFILIO
Case DescriptionRonald Bonfilio submitted a FOIA request to the Occupational Safety and Health Administration for records concerning deaths or injuries at jobs performed by Fort Meyer Construction, Anchor Construction, or Capitol Paving of D.C. OSHA told Bonfilio that there were no records of any deaths. It sent a redacted CD containing information about worker injuries. Bonfilio filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bonfilio filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-141COMPLAINT against OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION filed by RONALD J. BONFILIO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-142SUMMONS (3) Issued as to OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-03-023NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/27/17., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/27/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/29/2017.) (td) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-135AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Occupational Safety and Health Administration by RONALD J. BONFILIO. (td) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-296ANSWER to 1 Complaint by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-24MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/24/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/9/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-287MOTION for Order to Strike Plaintiff's Subpoena by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-01MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Order to Strike Subpoena. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-038Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-039NOTICE of Filing Error by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-09MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion to Stay: The proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED until June 8, 2017. On that date, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/9/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-06-0810Joint STATUS REPORT by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the proceedings in this case shall continue to be STAYED until July 25, 2017. On or by that date, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report informing the Court of the status of their discussions and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/9/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-09Case Stayed. (nbn) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-07-2511PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Motion to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall proceed according to the following deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than September 8, 2017; Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than October 8, 2017; Defendant's Reply shall be filed no later than October 23, 2017; and a Joint Appendix shall be filed no later than November 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/27/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-09-0612Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0613ERRATA by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-07MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before October 9, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition shall be due on or before November 8, 2017. Defendant's reply shall be due on or before November 23, 2017. The joint appendix shall be due on or before December 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/7/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/9/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/8/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/23/2017. Joint Appendix due by 12/13/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-10-0514Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-06MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due October 24, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition is due November 22, 2017; Defendant's reply is due December 7, 2017; and the joint appendix is due December 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/6/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/24/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/22/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/7/2017. Joint Appendix due by 12/27/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-2415MOTION for Summary Judgment by OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Declaration Plick, # 5 Declaration Janack, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C (part 1), # 9 Exhibit C (part 2), # 10 Exhibit D)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-3016MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by RONALD J. BONFILIO (td) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-07MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's opposition to motion for summary judgment due by January 7, 2018. Defendant's reply is due by January 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/7/2016. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/7/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/21/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff