Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSingh v. United States Postal Service
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2017cv00233
Date Filed2017-02-14
Date Closed2017-07-10
JudgeU.S. District Judge John C Coughenour
PlaintiffKeerut Singh
Case DescriptionKeerut Singh, a former employee, submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Postal Service for his personnel and background check file. The Postal Service sent Singh some records from his personnel file, but told Singh that background check records were maintained by the U.S. Postal Inspection Service. He sent his request there, but the Postal Inspection Service said it had no background check records on him. Singh appealed the decisions, but then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUnited States Postal Service
AppealNinth Circuit 17-35571
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [8]
Opinion/Order [19]
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [29]
Opinion/Order [33]
Opinion/Order [38]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-141COMPLAINT (NO FEE/NO IFP) against defendant(s) United States Postal Service (Summons(es) not issued), filed by Keerut Singh. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Email requesting new case)(CDA) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-152LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA) Modified on 2/15/2017 cc plaintiff via U.S. Mail(CDA). (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-16FILING FEE : $ 400.00, receipt number SEA083057 (CDA) Modified on 2/16/2017 (CDA). (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-163Summonses Issued as to defendant(s) United States Postal Service. Mailed to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (CDA) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-174NOTICE: Plaintiff Keerut Singh has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-265AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Civil Process Clerk on 2/22/2017, filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 02/26/2017)
2017-02-276AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Office Of The U.S. Attorney General on 2/24/2017, filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-287Stipulated MOTION for Order Directing Service By United States Marshal , filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. Noting Date 2/28/2017, (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-03-018ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by US Marshal as to United States Postal Service; granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Directing Service By United States Marshal ; directing Clerk to issue summons. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (swt) (cc: USMO) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-019Summons Issued as to defendant United States Postal Service. (swt) (Sent via interoffice mail to USMO) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-1310MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 5/23/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-1311ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-2412NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tricia S. Boerger on behalf of Defendant United States Postal Service. (Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-2413ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Postal Service.(Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-3014MOTION to Compel Discovery , filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement RFA) Noting Date 4/14/2017, (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-04-1015RESPONSE, by Defendant United States Postal Service, to 14 MOTION to Compel Discovery . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)(Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1116SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed by US Marshals Service upon defendant United States Postal Service on 3/27/2017 (SWT) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-1217REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh, TO RESPONSE to 14 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EVIDENCE TO REPLY)(Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-05-0318OBJECTIONS re 14 MOTION to Compel Discovery , 17 Reply to Response to Motion Defendant's Objections by Plaintiff Keerut Singh (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-1119ORDER denying plaintiff's 14 Motion to Compel by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-2320MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE held before United States District Judge John C. Coughenour; Courtroom Deputy Clerk Paul Pierson; Court Reporter Debbie Zurn; Plaintiff(s) Counsel Keerut Singh, in pro per; Defendant(s) Counsel Tricia Boerger. The case was called and counsel made their appearance. The Court inquires of counsel concerning their desired trial date and time estimate for trial. Note that all depositions, discovery and perpetuation, must be completed before the discovery completion date. Counsel are advised that this case is one of several cases set for the week described below. Counsel shall be prepared to commence trial as scheduled, but understand that the trial may have to be continued. Counsel are directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov 2-4 weeks in advance of the trial date regarding the Court`s trial calendar. Case management dates are established as follows: COURT TRIAL is set for 4/16/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 4/6/2018, Pleading amendment/3rd pty action due by 7/7/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/9/2018, Discovery cutoff is 120 days before trial, and the dispositive motion filing deadline is 90 days before trial. Counsel shall attend Courtroom Technology Training at least 1 month in advance of the trial date in order to become familiar utilizing the NEW A/V equipment now available in the courtroom. Training is held at 3:00 p.m. on the 1st and 3rd Wednesday of each month in Courtroom 18B. (PP) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-05-3121MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case filed in C17-822-RAJ, Dkt. 6. The Court does not deem the two cases related and will not transfer or consolidate them. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-0122MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery , filed by Defendant United States Postal Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment) Noting Date 6/23/2017, (Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0123DECLARATION of Tricia Boerger filed by Defendant United States Postal Service re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0124DECLARATION of Janine Castorina filed by Defendant United States Postal Service re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - F)(Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0125DECLARATION of Kimberly Mungin filed by Defendant United States Postal Service re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D)(Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0126DECLARATION of Robert Fullerton filed by Defendant United States Postal Service re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-1927RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Keerut Singh, to 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Evidence)(Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-2328REPLY, filed by Defendant United States Postal Service, TO RESPONSE to 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery (Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-1029ORDER granting Defendant's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1030JUDGMENT BY COURT granting the USPS's 22 motion for summary judgment. Singh's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. (PM) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1031MOTION to Stay re 29 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 30 Judgment by Court Judgment Pending Appeal , filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. Noting Date 7/10/2017, (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1132MOTION for Reconsideration re 29 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 31 MOTION to Stay re 29 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 30 Judgment by Court Judgment Pending Appeal , 30 Judgment by Court , filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. Noting Date 7/11/2017, (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1133MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Reconsideration and dismissing as moot Plaintiff's 31 Motion to Stay. Authorized signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1134NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re 29 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 30 Judgment by Court by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1135Second MOTION to Stay , filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. Noting Date 7/11/2017, (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff