Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00286
Date Filed2017-02-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Public Integrity submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for National Nuclear Security Administration performance and evaluation plans. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after several inquiries concerning the status of the request resulted in no resolution, the Center for Public Integrity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4843529) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons to Attorney General)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-15Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (md) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-164ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 16, 2017. (NS) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/16/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2017. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-03-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/22/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 2/23/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Duplicate Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-208ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-219ORDER. The parties shall MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The parties shall file the schedule not later than APRIL 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/21/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report proposing a schedule due by 4/20/2017 (dot) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-04-1810Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-24MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. That motion was filed two days before the referenced Joint Status Report was due with the Court, and therefore fails to comply with this Court's Standing Order, which instructs that [m]otions for extensions of time must be filed at least four (4) business days prior to the first affected deadline. ECF No. 4, at 3. Nonetheless, in this instance, and for good cause shown, the Court shall GRANT the Motion. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report no later than APRIL 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/24/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/27/2017. (dot) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-2711Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, wherein they represent that Defendant has made a production of responsive documents from one field office, with some redactions, and expects to produce several thousand additional pages from six other field offices. The parties request that the Court not set a briefing schedule at this time, given that the end date for the government's production is still uncertain. Accordingly, the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by June 27, 2017, updating the Court regarding the government's production, and proposing a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/1/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2017. (dot) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-06-2712Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, wherein they represent that Defendant has made a production of responsive documents, and expects to produce several thousand more pages shortly. Accordingly, the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by August 28, 2017, updating the Court regarding the government's production, and proposing a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/30/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2017. (dot) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-08-2813Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, which indicates that "Defendant has complied with the agreed upon productions so far and is on track with the originally agreed upon production schedule." Accordingly, the parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report by OCTOBER 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/5/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2017. (dot) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-18Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-10-3014Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-31MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 14 Joint Status Report filed by the parties on October 30, 2017, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report by December 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/31/2017. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/29/2017 (tj) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff