Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOZEN O'CONNOR v. U.S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
City
Case Number2:2017cv00728
Date Filed0000-00-00
Date ClosedOpen
Judge
PlaintiffCOZEN O'CONNOR
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Cozen O'Connor submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning a forfeiture by a bank in Cuba relating to abuses against two Cuban nationals. After hearing nothing more from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-151COMPLAINT against U.S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 154939.), filed by COZEN O'CONNOR. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gs) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-152Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COZEN O'CONNOR.(gs) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-15Summons Issued as to U.S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/16/17, 1 Forwarded To: AUSA (gs) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-163NOTICE by COZEN O'CONNOR re 1 Complaint Praecipe to Attach Exhibits A, B and C to Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(LEONARD, THOMAS) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-174Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-03-145NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN KINT on behalf of COZEN O'CONNOR with Certificate of Service(KINT, BRIAN) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
2017-03-206Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(REID, SCOTT) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-237AFFIDAVIT of Service by Calvin Jones re: served Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Case Management Track Designation Form, Disclosure Statement upon David Burroughs by Personal on 03-10-17 (LEONARD, THOMAS) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-318NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/1/2017 04:45 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS. (Attachments: # 1 Thomas Aloysius Leonard, IV, Esquire, # 2 Scheduling & Discovery Policy-Counsel.pdf)(mvh, ) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-059NOTICE of Appearance by HAYES A. HUNT on behalf of COZEN O'CONNOR with Certificate of Service(HUNT, HAYES) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff