Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. U.S. Department of Defense
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv01228
Date Filed2017-02-17
Date Closed2017-06-28
JudgeJudge Loretta A. Preska
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionReporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Defense for an August 2016 report entitled "NSA Should Take Additional Steps in Its Privileged Access-Related Secure-the-Net Initiatives." The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-171COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Defense. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13329117)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-172CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-173RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Finaciero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-174REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Defense, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-175NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian MacDougall on behalf of Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (MacDougall, Ian) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-21CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (kl) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-21Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. (kl) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-21Case Designated ECF. (kl) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-216ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Defense. (kl) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-03-177CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Dominika Tarczynska dated March 17, 2017. Document filed by U.S. Department of Defense.(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-208ORDER granting 7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer U.S. Department of Defense answer due 4/24/2017: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/17/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-04-219ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Department of Defense.(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-2710ORDER OF CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/22/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/26/2017) (cla) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-1911LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Ian MacDougall dated May 19, 2017 re: parties' joint proposed schedule. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company.(MacDougall, Ian) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-1912MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 11 Letter filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. ENDORSEMENT: In addition, the May 22 conference is adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/19/2017) (ap) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-06-2813STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, as follows: 1. DOD's above-referenced production resolves Plaintiffs' FOIA claims in this matter. 2. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, 3. The pa1ties understand and agree that this Stipulation and Order contains the entire agreement between them, and that no statements, representations, promises, agreements, or negotiations, oral or otherwise, between the parties or their counsel that are not included herein shall be of any force or effect. The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed and all pending motions denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/28/2017) (jwh) Modified on 6/29/2017 (jwh). (Entered: 06/29/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff