Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty Inc v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictEastern District of Wisconsin
CityMilwaukee
Case Number2:2017cv00229
Date Filed2017-02-21
Date Closed2017-09-14
JudgeJudge J P Stadtmueller
PlaintiffWisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty Inc
Case DescriptionThe Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning DOJ's investigation of the Milwaukee Parental Choice Program for allegations of discrimination against students with disabilities. WILL also asked for inclusion in the educational fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Civil Division contacted WILL indicating that its request was considered complex and that it would take more than a year to process. WILL then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [16]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-211COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2522811) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - DOJ Response, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - FOIA Follow Up Letter)(Esenberg, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2017: # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).
2017-02-212REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Esenberg, Richard)
2017-02-213DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Esenberg, Richard)
2017-02-21NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
2017-02-21Summons Issued as to Department of Justice. (asc)
2017-03-024Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Department of Justice. (Larsen, Christian)
2017-03-035Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by All Plaintiffs. (Kamenick, Thomas)
2017-03-03Due to non-consent of the parties case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
2017-03-226Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty Inc served upon US Attorney General on 3/3/2017 (Kamenick, Thomas)
2017-03-227Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty Inc served upon US Dept. of Justice on 3/3/2017 (Kamenick, Thomas)
2017-03-228Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty Inc served upon US Atty - Eastern District of WI on 2/27/2017 (Kamenick, Thomas)
2017-03-279Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by All Plaintiffs served upon US Attorney - ED of WI on 3/24/2017 (Esenberg, Richard)
2017-04-2410Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of Justice.(Larsen, Christian)
2017-04-2511NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 5/16/2017. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
2017-05-1612Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Department of Justice. (Larsen, Christian)
2017-05-1913Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 5/19/2017 (Court Reporter Sheryl Stawski) (km)
2017-05-2514TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 5/25/2017: Interim Settlement Report due by 9/25/2017; Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2017; Final Settlement Report due by 1/25/2018; Motions in Limine and all other Non-Dispositive Motions due by 2/2/2018; Single Joint/Final Pretrial Report due by close of business on 2/8/2018; Trial Briefs due by 2/9/2018; Briefs in Opposition due by 2/16/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Court Trial set for 2/20/2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
2017-09-1315STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larsen, Christian)
2017-09-1416ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 9/14/2017 ADOPTING 15 Parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff