Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBerry v. US Attorney's Office-State of NH
DistrictDistrict of New Hampshire
CityConcord
Case Number1:2017cv00077
Date Filed2017-02-22
Date Closed2017-08-25
JudgeJudge Steven J. McAuliffe
PlaintiffJason T. Berry
Case DescriptionJason Berry, a former New Hampshire probation and parole officer, submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the U.S. Attorney for New Hampshire for records about himself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Berry filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUS Attorney's Office-State of NH
AppealFirst Circuit 17-1946
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-221COMPLAINT against US Attorney's Office-State of NH (Filing fee $400 receipt number 14649014689) filed by Jason T. Berry. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Waiver, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mc) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-22Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:17-cv-77-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-23NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click HERE .(mc) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-232Summons issued by mail as to US Attorney's Office-State of NH. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 Notice ECF) (mc) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-05-053Return of Service Executed as to US Attorney's Office-State of NH by Jason T. Berry. Served/Mailed on 5/2/2017. Answer Follow Up on 7/5/2017. (jbw) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-224MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by US Attorney's Office-State of NH. Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party US Attorney's Office-State of NH(pty:dft). Follow up on Objection on 6/21/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Declaration of Judith Northrup Prindiville, # 3 Attachment to Exhibit A-1 FOIA Request, # 4 Attachment to Exhibit A-2 Acknowledgment Letters, # 5 Exhibit (Affidavit) B - Declaration of Vinay J. Jolly, # 6 Attachment to Exhibit B-1 FOIA Request, # 7 Attachment to Exhibit B-2 Acknowledgment Letter)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-235NOTICE Regarding Summary Judgment.(jbw) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-06-236OBJECTION to 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment served on 6/23/2017 filed by Jason T. Berry. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A: Declaration of Plaintiff Jason T. Berry, # 3 Attachment 1 to Exhibit A: 3/13/2017 Letter to Plaintiff)(jbw) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-23ORAL Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by US Attorney's Office. Follow up on Reply on 7/7/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(de) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-077REPLY to Objection to Motion re 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by US Attorney's Office-State of NH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Supplemental Declaration of Vinay J. Jolly)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-08-25/// ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 Motion for Summary Judgment. Text of Order: Granted. For the reasons given in the government's supporting memorandum and reply memorandum, it is plain that no genuine dispute of material facts exists, and the government is entitled to judgment as a matter of law. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-258JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (jbw) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff