Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFIX THE COURT v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00332
Date Filed2017-02-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffFIX THE COURT
Case DescriptionFix the Court submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning complaints and performance reviews of Supreme Court nominee Neil Gorsuch. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Fix the Court filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-241COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4853500) filed by FIX THE COURT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Dep't of Justice, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-24Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-242SUMMONS (3)Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-03-103NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-04-034ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-045STANDING FOIA ORDER. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/4/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order For Further Proceedings due by 4/25/2017. (mac) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-246Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-25MINUTE ORDER granting 6 joint motion for extension of time. The parties shall file their joint proposed scheduling order by no later than May 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/25/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/25/2017. (mac) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-257Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-26MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' 7 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that by no later than September 1, 2017 the Department of Justice shall complete a draft Vaughn index of those documents to date determined to be responsive to part (b) of plaintiff's FOIA request that have not been posted on the website of the Senate Judiciary Committee. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than September 15, 2017 the parties shall submit a joint status report informing the Court whether motions will be necessary and, if so, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/26/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 9/1/2017. Status Report due by 9/15/2017. (mac) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-07-278STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/27/2017.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff