Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNewland Entities, Inc. v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
DistrictEastern District of California
CitySacramento
Case Number2:2017cv00437
Date Filed2017-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Morrison C. England, Jr
PlaintiffNewland Entities, Inc.
Case DescriptionNewland Entities, Inc. submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for emails and communications between a number of people in the agency's Sacramento office concerning the agency's contract with Newland Entities. The agency asked Newland Entities to narrow its request. Newland Entities narrowed the time frame. However, the agency told Newland Entities that its request was still too broad and would be unduly burdensome. Newland Entities then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Request - Specificity, Choice of format - Burdensome

DefendantUnited States Army Corps of Engineers
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-02-271COMPLAINT against United States Army Corps of Engineers (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6934873) by Newland Entities, Inc.. Attorney Silberman, Aaron P. added. (Silberman, Aaron) Modified on 2/28/2017 (Becknal, R). (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-272CIVIL COVER SHEET by Newland Entities, Inc. (Silberman, Aaron) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-283SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States Army Corps of Engineers* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Aaron P. Silberman* *Rogers Joseph O'Donnell* *311 California Street* *San Francisco, California 94104*. (Reader, L) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-02-284CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP) (Reader, L) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-03-065SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Newland Entities, Inc. served on 3/1/2017, answer due 3/22/2017. (Silberman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-066CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Newland Entities, Inc.. (Silberman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-067CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Newland Entities, Inc.. (Silberman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-168NOTICE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (F.R.C.P. 7.1) by Newland Entities, Inc.. (Silberman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff