Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJohnson v. Illinois State Police
DistrictCentral District of Illinois
CitySpringfield
Case Number3:2017cv03059
Date Filed2017-03-01
Date Closed2017-03-24
JudgeJudge Colin Stirling Bruce
PlaintiffTJ Johnson
DefendantIllinois State Police
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-261Complaint and no copies by T.J. Johnson (Envelope postmarked 1/23/17). (tt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2017: # 1 Envelope) (tt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2017: # 1 Envelope) (SKR, ilcd). Modified on 3/2/2017 to delete text from NDIL (SKR, ilcd). (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-262PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (tt, ) (SKR, ilcd). (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-263Petition by Plaintiff T.J. Johnson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit). (tt, ) Modified on 3/1/2017 to change document type (SKR, ilcd). (SKR, ilcd). (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-03-014ORDER: The Court transfers this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Springfield Division, for imposition of an initial filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall not issue summons unless the transferee court so directs. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/1/2017. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (SKR, ilcd). (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-015TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois, Springfield Division the electronic record. (jjr, ) (SKR, ilcd). (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-016Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00634. (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-017NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802. Merit Review Deadline set for 3/21/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues) (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-02TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 3/2/17. The merit review hearing is set before Judge Harold A. Baker on 3/9/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call). No writ will issue as Plaintiff has Case No. 17-4043 set for merit review hearing on the same date and time, and a writ has been issued in that case for plaintiff's telephone appearance on March 9, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. (SKR, ilcd) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-038Letter from the Clerk of the Court requesting trust fund ledgers (mailed to Menard CC Trust Fund Department) (SKR, ilcd) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/3/2017) (SKR, ilcd). (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-09Minute Entry for proceedings held 3/9/17 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance of plaintiff TJ Johnson by telephone. Merit Review Hearing held. This case is to be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Written order to be entered. (Court Reporter LC.) (SKR, ilcd) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-139+++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by TJ Johnson (SKR, ilcd) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/13/17 granting 3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $6.44. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (copy mailed to Menard Trust Fund Office). (SKR, ilcd) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-2410MERIT REVIEW ORDER Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 3/24/17. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: the plaintiff's complaints are dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A. These cases are closed. The plaintiff must still pay the full docketing fee of $350 even though his case has been dismissed. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall continue to make monthly payments to the Clerk of Court, as directed in the Court's prior order. If the plaintiff wishes to appeal this dismissal, he may file a notice of appeal with this court within 30 days of the entry of judgment. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (SKR, ilcd) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff