Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00382
Date Filed2017-03-03
Date Closed2017-07-28
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted three FOIA requests to the IRS for records concerning certain IRS policies. Cause of Action Institute also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and took a 10-day extension for each, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-031COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4862752) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons Treasury, # 10 Summons IRS, # 11 Summons AG, # 12 Summons Clerk)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-032Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-03Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (sth) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-033SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-034NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 3/10/2017 (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 3/9/2017 (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/10/2017. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-158RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/13/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/12/2017. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-04-079GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 7, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-1010MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before May 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 12, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Responsive Pleadings due by 5/10/2017 (hs) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-2411Joint STATUS REPORT re: Joint Scheduling Statement pursuant to General Order, Para. 6 by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 11 Parties' Joint Scheduling Statement, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before June 5, 2017, governing the production of the requested documents and the filing of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 26, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/5/2017 (hs) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-1012ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-06-0513Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff and Defendants by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 13 Parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before July 15, 2017, governing the status of production of the requested documents and the filing of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 9, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/15/2017 (hs) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-07-1414STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's 14 Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a joint status report on or before July 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 17, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/28/2017 (hs) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-2815STIPULATION of Dismissal joint, with prejudice by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-28MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 15 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 28, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff