Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00388
Date Filed2017-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffKEN VOGEL
PlaintiffJOSH GERSTEIN
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and Politico Reporters Ken Vogel and Josh Gerstein submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and various components for records concerning implementation of President Trump's Jan. 27 travel ban. The requesters indicated that they would not challenge the redaction of personal information of government employees below the GS-14 level. The Department of Homeland Security and the component agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, JMP, Vogel, and Gerstein filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-031COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4863550) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, JOSH GERSTEIN, KEN VOGEL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons DHS, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-03Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-233NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Berns on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-284Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-28MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is now due on or before May 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/28/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-28Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Responsive pleading due by 5/12/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-05-125ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - TSA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - CBP Request, # 3 Exhibit 3 - ICE Request, # 4 Exhibit 4 - USCIS Request, # 5 Exhibit 5 - DHS Request)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-126ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before June 16, 2017. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 05/12/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-12Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/16/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-06-167Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 June 16, 2017, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before July 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/19/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-218Joint STATUS REPORT by JOSH GERSTEIN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KEN VOGEL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 8 July 21, 2017, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before September 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/25/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-25Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-09-059Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 September 5, 2017, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before October 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/06/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-10-0510Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 October 5, 2017, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before December 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/06/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/07/2017)
2017-12-1811Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before January 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/18/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2018-01-1912Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before March 2, 2018, that updates the court on their efforts to resolve any outstanding issues and, if necessary, proposes a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/19/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-02-1613NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Elizabeth Murray Tulis on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Substituting for attorney Matthew J. Berns (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-03-0214Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 March 2, 2018, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before April 2, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/02/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2018. (mac) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-04-0215Joint STATUS REPORT by JOSH GERSTEIN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KEN VOGEL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 April, 2, 2018, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before April 23, 2018, that updates the court on their progress toward resolving the matter and proposes a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/04/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/23/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-2316Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-23MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 April, 23, 2018, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before May 7, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/23/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-23Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-1017Joint STATUS REPORT by JOSH GERSTEIN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KEN VOGEL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 May 10, 2018, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before May 21, 2018, advising the court whether the parties have resolved all outstanding disputes and, if not, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/10/2018 (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint status report or proposed briefing schedule due by 5/21/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-2118Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before June 22, 2018, concerning their efforts to resolve this matter, including the issue of attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/21/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff