Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00390
Date Filed2017-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffNOAH SHACHTMAN
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and Daily Beast Reporter Noah Shachtman submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Legal Counsel at the Department of Justice for any records concerning discussions between OLC and the Trump White House pertaining to the legality of President Trump's Jan. 27 travel ban. JMP and Shachtman also submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and four of its components concerning implementation of the travel ban. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, JMP and Shachtman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-031COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4863750) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons DHS, # 4 Summons DOJ, # 5 Summons USADC, # 6 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-03Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-032SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-063ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 6, 2017. (NS) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-234NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Berns on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-285Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 5 Consent Motion, which requests an extension of time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint. For good cause shown, the Consent Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by MAY 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/29/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/12/2017. (dot) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-05-086Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-10MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' 6 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, which requests leave to file an amended complaint in this action, and indicates that Defendants do not oppose this relief. This Motion is GRANTED, as the Court finds that "justice so requires." Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, ECF No. 6-2, is deemed filed as of this date. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/10/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-107FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN.(znmw) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-248ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 7 Amended Complaint filed by NOAH SHACHTMAN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - OLC Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - DHS Request, # 3 Exhibit 3 - TSA Request, # 4 Exhibit 4 - CBP Request, # 5 Exhibit 5 - ICE Request, # 6 Exhibit 6 - USCIS Request)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-319ORDER. The parties shall file a schedule not later than JUNE 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/31/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall file a scheduled by 6/7/2017. (dot) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-0510Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. For good cause shown, that Motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file the Joint Status Report by JUNE 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/6/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/16/2017. (dot) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-1611Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendants have initiated searches for documents, and that some responsive materials have already been produced, and that the parties are conferring regarding the remaining issues in this matter. Accordingly, the parties shall file a further status report by JULY 21, 2017, updating the Court regarding the status of document productions, and proposing a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/21/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2017. (dot) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-07-2112Joint STATUS REPORT by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-27MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendants have initiated searches for documents, and that some responsive materials have already been produced, and that the parties are conferring regarding the remaining issues in this matter. Accordingly, the parties shall file a further status report by SEPTEMBER 5, 2017, updating the Court regarding the status of document productions, and proposing a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/27/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2017. (dot) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff