Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLe, et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2017cv00355
Date Filed2017-03-03
Date Closed2017-05-31
JudgeJudge Michael W. Mosman
PlaintiffKim Thien Le
PlaintiffJose Antonio Quintero Duran
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-031Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4926352 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by kim thien le, Jose Antonio quintero duran against USCIS (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Renison, Brent) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-032Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/3/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/31/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 7/31/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-033Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (cib) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-04-034Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Renison, Brent) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-065Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment) (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-05-316ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorney fees. Signed on 5/31/17 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff