Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00397
Date Filed2017-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning the investigation of Michael Flynn for his contact with the Russian ambassador. Judicial Watch submitted the same request to the FBI and to the Department of Treasury. The FBI and Treasury acknowledged receipt of the request, while the CIA did not. However, after hearing nothing further from either agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-061COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4865702) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons CIA, # 3 Summons DOJ, # 4 Summons DOT, # 5 Summons US Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 6 Summons US Attorney General)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-062LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sth) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-073SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(sth) Modified: Summons 4 erroneously filed. 3/8/2017 (jd). (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-084SUMMONS (1) Issued as to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/13/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/12/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/13/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-04-126ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-17MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 5/8/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/17/17. (DJS) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule/Order due by 5/8/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-05-087Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-17MINUTE ORDER: Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' FOIA requests no later than May 19, 2017. The parties shall file another joint status report and proposed order on May 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/17/17. (DJS) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response due by 5/19/2017. Joint Status Report due by 5/26/2017. (tb) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-268Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-06MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 8 , it is hereby ordered that Defendants shall file their anticipated motion for summary judgment by August 21, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its combined cross-motion and opposition by September 22, 2017. Defendants shall file their combined reply and opposition by October 23, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion by November 6, 2017. The FBI's arguments in this initial round of briefing may rely solely on Exemption 7(A). Any other basis for withholding documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request are preserved and, if necessary, may be raised in future proceedings. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/6/17. (DJS) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 8/21/2017. Response/Cross Motion due by 9/22/2017. Reply/Response to Cross Motion due by 10/23/2017. Reply to Cross Motions due by 11/6/2017. (tb) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-08-219MOTION for Leave to File Ex Parte, In Camera Versions of the FBI's Summary Judgment Filings by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-2110MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Index of Exhibits, # 5 Hardy Declaration (FBI), # 6 Jordan Declaration (Treasury), # 7 Shiner Declaration (CIA))(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-09-1911Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Reset Briefing Schedule by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-22MINUTE ORDER: Granting 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Briefing Deadlines. Plaintiff's Opposition and Combined Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due October 6, 2017. Defendants' Reply & Combined Response due November 21, 2017. Plaintiff's Reply due December 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/22/17. (DJS) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 10/6/2017. Response to Cross Motion due by 11/21/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 12/5/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/6/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/21/2017. (tb) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-30MINUTE ORDER: In the absence of any substantive response by the Plaintiff and for good cause shown, Defendants' 9 Motion for Leave to File is hereby granted. Defendants may redact law enforcement sensitive information on the publicly filed version of the FBI's filings and Defendants shall file unredacted versions of the FBI's filings ex parte and in camera. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/30/17. (DJS) (Entered: 09/30/2017)
2017-10-0612Unopposed MOTION to Modify <i Briefing Schedule by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) Modified event title on 10/10/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06MINUTE ORDER: Granting 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff shall file its cross-motion for summary judgment and combined opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment by October 11, 2017. Defendants shall file their combined reply/opposition by December 4, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its reply by December 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/6/17. (DJS) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 10/11/2017. Response to Cross Motion due by 12/4/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 12/18/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/11/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/4/2017. (tb) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-1113Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Statement of Facts filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-1114Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum and Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff