Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES v. UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION OFFICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00403
Date Filed2017-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffNORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES an Oregon non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionNorthwest Environmental Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning contracts with the Freshwater Trust and the Williamette Partnership. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but despite numerous queries to the agency concerning the status of the request, the agency failed to respond. Northwest Environmental Advocates then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE an agency of the United States of America, USDA, NRCS, Office of the Chief
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-061COMPLAINT against USDA, NRCS, Office of the Chief ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4866900) filed by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES,. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for NRCS (Proposed), # 3 Summons for AG (Proposed), # 4 Summons for US Atty. (Proposed))(Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (jd) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-173MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul Kampmeier, :Firm- Kampmeier & Knutsen PLLC, :Address- Kampmeier & Knutsen PLLC 615 Second Avenue, Suite 360, Seattle, WA 98104. Phone No. - (206) 223-4088. Fax No. - N/A Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4880292. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Paul Kampmeier, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting PHV)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-174AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE filed by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES.(Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-175LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES (Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-206NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/13/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/12/2017. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/13/17. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-289RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE served on 3/13/2017 (Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-04-0710ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/6/17. (zlsj) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-1111Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order And Extension Of Answer Deadline by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-2812ORDER granting 11 Motion for Scheduling Order. It is hereby ORDERED that Responsiveness to FOIA Request due by 5/30/2017. Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2017. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/27/17. (lsj) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-07-0713Joint STATUS REPORT by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-07Minute ORDER granting the parties' request 13 for an extension of time to submit a proposed case schedule. The parties shall submit a joint status report and proposed case schedule by August 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 7, 2017. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-08-0714Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-09-0715Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-10-0616Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-11-0317Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-12-0418Joint STATUS REPORT by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-2719ORDER directing parties to file an additional Joint Status Report by 1/12/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/22/17. (lsj) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-01-1220Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED CASE SCHEDULE by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-2221ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-02-0522SCHEDULING ORDER: Summary Judgment motions due by 2/7/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/9/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/30/2018. Reply brief in support of any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/18/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/2/18. (lsj) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-0623Joint STATUS REPORT and Joint Request to Vacate Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-0624Joint MOTION to Vacate 22 Scheduling Order, by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES, UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE. (See Docket Entry 23 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-0725ERRATA Signed Motion with Proposed Order by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE 24 MOTION to Vacate 22 Scheduling Order, filed by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE, NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-03-0126NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-0127Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-0928Joint STATUS REPORT and Request for Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-0929Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES, UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE. (See Docket Entry 28 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-04-2330Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-0431MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0432AFFIDAVIT re 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Paul Kampmeier by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0433AFFIDAVIT of David Bahr by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0434AFFIDAVIT of Nina Bell by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0435AFFIDAVIT of Bradley Moss by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0436AFFIDAVIT of Richard Smith by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-07NOTICE OF ERROR re 31 Motion for Attorney Fees; emailed to paul@kampmeierknutsen.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please do not refile. In the future, Affidavits should be filed with the Motion as attachments. (ztth, ) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-17MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Briefing Schedule. The Court adopts the dates set forth in the proposed briefing schedule. The proposed filing date of Plaintiff's Fee Petition is granted, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/17/2018. (lcrcl3) Modified on 5/17/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-2137Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2438ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs . Defendant's opposition due by 6/8/2018 and Plaintiff's reply due by 6/29/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/23/18. (lsj) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-0839Memorandum in opposition to re 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Fee demand letter, # 2 Exhibit B - Judicial Watch complaint, # 3 Exhibit C - McLoughlin Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-1440NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by UNITED STATES NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-2941REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by NORTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration SECOND DECLARATION OF PAUL KAMPMEIER IN SUPPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES, # 2 Text of Proposed Order REVISED [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar